431 S Almont LLC v. City of Beverly Hills et al
Plaintiff: 431 S Almont LLC
Defendant: Terence May and City of Beverly Hills
Case Number: 8:2024cv02031
Filed: September 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2024 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Terence May, (Quiller, Dominic)
November 7, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 by Judge James V. Selna. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. This corrects the order at Docket No. 19 which had an error on the document number. (es)
November 7, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #15 by Judge James V. Selna. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (es)
November 6, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 01/27/2025 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 01/17/2025. (eva)
November 6, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 5, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Beverly Hills.(Stumreiter, John)
November 5, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Beverly Hills, identifying Plaintiff and Defendants only. (Stumreiter, John)
November 5, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John J Stumreiter on behalf of Defendant City of Beverly Hills (Attorney John J Stumreiter added to party City of Beverly Hills(pty:dft))(Stumreiter, John)
November 5, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Terence May.(Attorney Dominic A Quiller added to party Terence May(pty:dft))(Quiller, Dominic)
October 15, 2024 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, upon Defendant Terence May served on 10/15/2024, answer due 11/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vardan Vardanyan - Code Enforcement Officer in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diligence)(Hagemann, Michael)
October 15, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, upon Defendant City of Beverly Hills served on 10/15/2024, answer due 11/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Megan Grilley - Analyst for Huma Ahmed - City Clerk of Beverly Hills in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Hagemann, Michael)
September 25, 2024 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
September 25, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants City of Beverly Hills, Terence May. (jtil)
September 24, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 24, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
September 19, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Hagemann, Michael)
September 19, 2024 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, identifying Georgia Z. Serafie. (Hagemann, Michael)
September 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Hagemann, Michael)
September 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38244693 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff 431 S Almont LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Michael Karl Hagemann added to party 431 S Almont LLC, a California Limited Liability Company(pty:pla))(Hagemann, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 431 S Almont LLC v. City of Beverly Hills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence May
Represented By: Dominic A Quiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Beverly Hills
Represented By: John J Stumreiter
Represented By: Steven J Rothans
Represented By: Mark D Rutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 431 S Almont LLC
Represented By: Michael Karl Hagemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?