Stout Law Firm, LLP et al v. Taulli et al
Plaintiff: Stout Law Firm, LLP
Defendant: Katherine Lamp, Es Ta, Sabrina Caprioli, Jose Corral Salomon, Jessica Strange, Sam Bianchi, Charlotte Taulli, Katherine M., Jade B., Briana M., Brenda Smith and James Russell Stout
Case Number: 8:2024cv02801
Filed: December 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 10 Notice of CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Defendants, identifying James R. Stout. (Attorney James R Stout added to party Jade B.(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Katherine Lamp(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Brenda Smith(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Katherine M.(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party James Russell Stout(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Charlotte Taulli(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Sam Bianchi(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Jose Corral Salomon(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Sabrina Caprioli(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Jessica Strange(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Briana M.(pty:dft), Attorney James R Stout added to party Es Ta(pty:dft))(Stout, James)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
January 3, 2025 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendants Jade B., Sam Bianchi, Sabrina Caprioli, Katherine Lamp, Briana M., Katherine M., Jose Corral Salomon, Brenda Smith, James Russell Stout, Jessica Strange, Es Ta, Charlotte Taulli. (jtil)
January 2, 2025 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
January 2, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
December 28, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP. (Stout, James)
December 28, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP. (Stout, James)
December 28, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (405 paid on 12/28/24, receipt number ACACDC-38828237), filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP.(Stout, James)
December 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38828237 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP. (Attorney James R Stout added to party Stout Law Firm, LLP(pty:pla))(Stout, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout Law Firm, LLP et al v. Taulli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Lamp
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Es Ta
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Caprioli
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Corral Salomon
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Strange
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Bianchi
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Taulli
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine M.
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade B.
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana M.
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Smith
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Russell Stout
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stout Law Firm, LLP
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?