Stout Law Firm, LLP et al v. Laurensays 5 et al
Plaintiff: Stout Law Firm, LLP and James Russell Stout
Defendant: Nikko B., Robert M., Ruby M., Melinda K., Alyssa M., Charlotte T., Kathryn M., Cassandra W., Laurensays 5, Does 1-50, inclusive and Lauren Antonia Neumann
Case Number: 8:2025cv00126
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Lauren Antonia Neumann, an individual (twdb)
March 19, 2025 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Lauren Antonia Neumann filed by Plaintiff James Russell Stout, Stout Law Firm, LLP. (Stout, James)
February 26, 2025 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Russell Stout, Stout Law Firm, LLP, upon Defendant Lauren Antonia Neumann served on 2/25/2025, answer due 3/18/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lauren Antonia Neumann in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Stout, James)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:24-cv-02801-FWS-(ADSx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:25-cv-00126-FWS-(ADSx). Signed by Judge Fred W. Slaughter (dve)
February 20, 2025 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #11 as to Defendant Lauren Antonia Neumann an individual. (twdb)
February 20, 2025 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP, James Russell Stout. (Stout, James)
February 19, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #12 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
February 18, 2025 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Plaintiff Stout Law Firm, LLP, James Russell Stout. (Stout, James)
February 18, 2025 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff James Russell Stout, Stout Law Firm, LLP(Stout, James)
January 27, 2025 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
January 24, 2025 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Nikko B., Melinda K., Laurensays 5, Alyssa M., Kathryn M., Robert M., Ruby M., Charlotte T., Cassandra W. (car)
January 24, 2025 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff STOUT LAW FIRM LLP, (Stout, James)
January 23, 2025 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff STOUT LAW FIRM LLP. (Stout, James)
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant STOUT LAW FIRM LLP. (Stout, James)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff STOUT LAW FIRM LLP. Related Case(s): 8:24-cv-2801 (Stout, James)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38964414 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff STOUT LAW FIRM LLP. (Attorney James R Stout added to party STOUT LAW FIRM LLP(pty:bkmov))(Stout, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout Law Firm, LLP et al v. Laurensays 5 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikko B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurensays 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Antonia Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stout Law Firm, LLP
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Russell Stout
Represented By: James R Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?