3MB, LLC
Debtor: 3MB, LLC
Us Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis and Office of the U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2020bk12642
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order to Continue Status Conference Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1717.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6817304) ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 12/2/2020 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse (jlns)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Denying #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (jlns)
October 7, 2020 Filing 74 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 10/7/2020 10:31:18 AM ]. File Size [ 12113 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:50:28 ]. (admin).
October 7, 2020 Filing 73 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1717.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6817304); Status Conference now to be held on 12/2/2020 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse (cwef)
October 7, 2020 Filing 72 Civil Minutes -- Motion Denied without prejudice Re: #32 - Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (admin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 71 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending August 31, 2020 (jlns) Modified on 10/7/2020 (jlns).
October 1, 2020 Filing 70 Certificate/Proof of Service of #69 Notice of Entry [LKW-2] (jlns)
October 1, 2020 Filing 69 Notice of Entry of #63 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [LKW-2] (jlns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 68 Certificate/Proof of Service of #66 Response/Reply, #67 Declaration [AG-1] (jlns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 67 Declaration of Amir Gamliel in support of #66 Response/Reply [AG-1] (jlns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 66 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association Re: #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (jlns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 65 Certificate/Proof of Service of #64 Status Conference Statement [LKW-5] (jlns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 64 Status Conference Statement [LKW-5] Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (jlns)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Granting #19 Motion/Application to Employ [LKW-2] (jlns)
September 28, 2020 Filing 62 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/22/2020 9:52:37 AM ]. File Size [ 669 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:47 ]. (admin).
September 25, 2020 Filing 61 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] (mfrs)
September 24, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate/Proof of Service of #54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3], #56 Declaration, #57 Declaration, #58 Exhibit(s) (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 59 Certificate/Proof of Service of #55 Notice of Hearing [LKW-3] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 58 Exhibit(s) to #54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 57 Declaration of Nathan M. Hodges in support of #54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 56 Declaration of Leonard K. Welsh in support of #54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 55 Notice of Hearing Re: #54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3] to be held on 10/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 13, Department B. (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 54 Motion/Application to Employ Nathan M. Hodges as Special Counsel [LKW-3] Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 53 Certificate/Proof of Service of #47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4], #49 Exhibit(s), #50 Declaration, #51 Declaration (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 52 Certificate/Proof of Service of #48 Notice of Hearing [LKW-4] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 51 Declaration of Robert Bell in support of #47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 50 Declaration of Nathan M. Hodges in support of #47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 49 Exhibit(s) to #47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4] (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of Hearing Re: #47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4] to be held on 10/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 13, Department B. (jlns)
September 24, 2020 Filing 47 Motion/Application to Compromise Controversy/Approve Settlement Agreement with City of Bakersfield [LKW-4] Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (jlns)
September 22, 2020 Filing 46 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #19 - Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] (admin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 Certificate/Proof of Service of #43 Opposition/Objection, #44 Declaration [AG-1] (jlns)
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 Declaration of Robert Bell in support of #43 Opposition/Objection [AG-1] (jlns)
September 22, 2020 Filing 43 Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC Re: #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (jlns)
September 21, 2020 Filing 42 Certificate/Proof of Service of #41 Change of Name and/or Address (jlns)
September 21, 2020 Filing 41 Change of Address for Creditor Alan Scott and Mary Charles Hair (jlns)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting #38 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice (jlns)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #38 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice (jlns)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 Certificate/Proof of Service of #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1], #33 Notice of Hearing, #34 Declaration, #35 Declaration, #36 Exhibit(s) (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 Exhibit(s) to #35 Declaration [AG-1] (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 Declaration of Matthew Furay in support of #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 Declaration of Amir Gamliel in support of #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Hearing Re: #32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] to be held on 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse. (jlns)
September 9, 2020 Filing 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [AG-1] Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (jlns)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate/Proof of Service of #30 Notice of Entry [LKW-1] (jlns)
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Entry of #29 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [LKW-1] (jlns)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Granting #13 Motion/Application to Employ [LKW-1] (jlns)
September 3, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate/Proof of Service of #27 Request for Special Notice (jlns)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor COUNTY OF KERN, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (jlns)
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association Re: #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] (jlns)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association Re: #13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate/Proof of Service of #20 Notice of Hearing [LKW-2] (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate/Proof of Service of #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2], #21 Declaration, #22 Exhibit(s) (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 Exhibit(s) to #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Gregory Braun in support of #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Re: #19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] to be held on 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 13, Department B. (jlns)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 Motion/Application to Employ CBIZ MHM, LLC as Accountant(s) [LKW-2] Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (jlns)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate/Proof of Service of #13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1], #14 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #16 Exhibit(s) (jlns)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Exhibit(s) to #13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (jlns)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Robert Bell in support of #13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (jlns)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Leonard K. Welsh in support of #13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (jlns)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (jlns)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition to be held on 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse (jlns)
August 16, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Non-Consent to Use of Cash Collateral (jlns)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. Last day to oppose discharge: 11/16/2020. (Brugger, Laurie)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (jlns)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (jlns)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 List of Equity Security Holders (lars)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Support Document/Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor 3MB, LLC (lars)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (lars)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (lars)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Master Address List (auto)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1717.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6817304)
August 11, 2020 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,717.00, Receipt Number: 363817, eFilingID: 6817304) (auto)

Search for this case: 3MB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: 3MB, LLC
Represented By: Leonard K. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Booker T. Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?