THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION
Debtor: THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION
Us Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis and Office of the U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Lisa A. Holder
Case Number: 1:2021bk10308
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 88 Civil Minutes -- Status conference Dropped from calendar Re: Status Conference Re: Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition - #1 - Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business Subchapter V) Due by 5/10/21. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6930993) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tsef). (admin)
April 4, 2021 Filing 87 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of #86 Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 2, 2021 Filing 86 Notice of Entry of Order as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: #85 Order Granting #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (tsef) (tsef)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order Granting #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (tsef)
April 1, 2021 Filing 84 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (tsef)
April 1, 2021 Filing 83 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending February 28, 2021 (tsef)
March 31, 2021 Filing 82 Civil Minutes -- Motion Conditionally granted Re: #59 - Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (admin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 81 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #50 - Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2] #50 - Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (admin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 80 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 3/31/2021 9:38:10 AM ]. File Size [ 885 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:41 ]. (admin).
March 29, 2021 Filing 79 Certificate/Proof of Service of #78 Request for Special Notice (fdis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 78 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Kern County Treasurer and Tax Collector Office Attn: Bankruptcy Division (fdis)
March 22, 2021 Filing 77 Certificate/Proof of Service of #76 Status Conference Statement [LKW-4] (vcaf)
March 22, 2021 Filing 76 Status Conference Statement [LKW-4] Re: #1 Voluntary Petition [LKW-4] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (vcaf)
March 20, 2021 Filing 75 Certificate/Proof of Service of #74 Notice of Entry [LKW-1] (smis)
March 20, 2021 Filing 74 Notice of Entry of #65 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [LKW-1] (smis)
March 19, 2021 Filing 73 Interim Order Re: #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2]. Hearing to be held on 3/31/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (tsef)
March 19, 2021 Filing 72 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order Re: #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 19, 2021 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was adjourned on 03/19/2021. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; Jorge A. Gaitan, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 4/9/2021 at 01:00 PM at the Telephone Conference number provided by your Trustee. (Gaitan, Jorge)
March 17, 2021 Filing 71 Certificate/Proof of Service of #70 Notice of Hearing [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 17, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Final Hearing Re: #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] to be held on 3/31/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (tsef)
March 17, 2021 Filing 69 Civil Minutes -- GRANTED ON AN INTERIM BASIS. Hearing continued Re: #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2]; Final Hearing to be held on 3/31/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (resf) Modified on 3/17/2021 (resf).
March 17, 2021 Filing 68 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 3/17/2021 9:30:24 AM ]. File Size [ 2039 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:30 ]. (admin).
March 16, 2021 Filing 67 Certificate/Proof of Service of #66 Declaration [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 16, 2021 Filing 66 Declaration of Leonard K. Welsh in support of #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting #17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh [LKW-1] (tsef)
March 12, 2021 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was adjourned on 03/12/21. Debtor Did Not Appear; Counsel of Record Appeared; Jorge Gaitan, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/19/2021 at 02:30 PM at the Telephone Conference number provided by your Trustee. (Brugger, Laurie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 64 Certificate/Proof of Service of #60 Notice of Hearing [LKW-3] (tsef)
March 10, 2021 Filing 63 Certificate/Proof of Service of #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3], #61 Declaration, #62 Exhibit(s) (tsef)
March 10, 2021 Filing 62 Exhibit(s) to #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (tsef)
March 10, 2021 Filing 61 Declaration of Thomas J. Anton in support of #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] (tsef)
March 10, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Hearing Re: #59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] to be held on 3/31/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (tsef)
March 10, 2021 Filing 59 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [LKW-3] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (tsef)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Granting #22 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [ZM-1] (tsef)
March 8, 2021 Copy Charge for Certification - (Fee Paid $.50) (eFilingID: 6941854) (vcaf)
March 8, 2021 Certification Request (Fee Paid $11) (eFilingID: 6941853) (vcaf)
March 8, 2021 Certification Fee Paid ($11.00, Receipt Number: 367942, eFilingID: 6941853) (auto)
March 8, 2021 Certification Pages Fee Paid ($0.50, Receipt Number: 367942, eFilingID: 6941854) (auto)
March 5, 2021 Filing 57 Certificate/Proof of Service of #56 Notice of Hearing [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 5, 2021 Filing 56 Notice of Hearing Re: #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] to be held on 3/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting #47 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 54 Certificate/Proof of Service of #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2], #51 Declaration, #52 Declaration, #53 Exhibit(s) (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 53 Exhibit(s) to #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 52 Declaration of Trinette Lidgett in support of #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 51 Declaration of Thomas Anton in support of #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 49 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #47 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [LKW-2], #48 Declaration (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 48 Declaration of Leonard K. Welsh in support of #47 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [LKW-2] (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 47 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [LKW-2] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (tsef)
March 4, 2021 Filing 46 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #22 - Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (admin)
March 4, 2021 Filing 45 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 3/4/2021 10:30:49 AM ]. File Size [ 8120 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:50 ]. (admin).
March 4, 2021 Hearing Re: #50 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [LKW-2], #50 Motion/Application for Adequate Protection [LKW-2] to be held on 3/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at Fresno Courtroom 11, Department A. (tsef)
March 3, 2021 Filing 44 Certificate/Proof of Service of #43 Supplemental Document [ZM-1] (tsef)
March 3, 2021 Filing 43 Supplemental #41 Response/Reply [ZM-1] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (tsef)
March 2, 2021 Filing 42 Certificate/Proof of Service of #41 Response/Reply [ZM-1] (jflf)
March 2, 2021 Filing 41 Response/Reply Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION Re: #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (jflf)
February 24, 2021 Filing 40 Certificate/Proof of Service of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1], #24 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #25 Declaration, #26 Declaration, #27 Declaration, #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362), #32 Amended Notice of Hearing (tsef)
February 19, 2021 Filing 39 Certificate of Mailing of Memo to File Re: Calendar Correction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 38 Amended Master Address List (fdis)
February 19, 2021 Filing 37 Amended Verification and Master Address List (Fee Paid $32) (eFilingID: 6935503) (tsef)
February 19, 2021 Filing 36 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (fdis)
February 19, 2021 Filing 35 Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (fdis)
February 19, 2021 Amendment Fee Paid ($32.00, Receipt Number: 367558, eFilingID: 6935503) (auto)
February 18, 2021 Filing 34 Certificate of Mailing of Order Setting Status Conference as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
February 18, 2021 Filing 33 Certificate/Proof of Service of #32 Amended Notice of Hearing [ZM-1] (jlns)
February 18, 2021 Filing 32 Amended Notice of Hearing Re: #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] to be held on 3/4/2021 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse. (jlns)
February 17, 2021 Motion Fee Paid ($188.00, Receipt Number: 367498, eFilingID: 6934429) (auto)
February 17, 2021 Filing 31 Memo to File Re: Calendar Correction as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (vmcf)
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 Certificate/Proof of Service of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1], #23 Notice of Hearing, #24 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #25 Declaration, #26 Declaration, #27 Declaration, #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 29 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 28 Exhibit(s) to #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 27 Declaration of Jacob L. Eaton in support of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 26 Declaration of Nicolas J. Street in support of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 25 Declaration of Daniel T. Clifford in support of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Hearing Re: #22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] to be held on 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse. (fdis)
February 17, 2021 Filing 22 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay [ZM-1] Filed by Creditors Beverly J. Stanton, Thomas M. Stanton, Elizabeth Orozco, Christina King Canaday, Jamie Turner, Angela Orozco, Daniel T. Clifford, Elaine Clifford (Fee Paid $188)(eFilingID: 6934429) (fdis) Modified on 2/18/2021 (lshs).
February 16, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1], #18 Declaration, #19 Declaration, #20 Exhibit(s) (fdis)
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 Exhibit(s) to #17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (fdis)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 Declaration of Leonard K. Welsh in support of #17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (fdis)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 Declaration of Thomas Anton in support of #17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] (fdis)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 Motion/Application to Employ Leonard K. Welsh as Attorney(s) [LKW-1] Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (fdis)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition to be held on 4/8/2021 at 10:30 AM at Bakersfield Federal Courthouse ; Pre-Status Report Due By 3/25/2021. (pdes)
February 14, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
February 13, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/12/2021 at 01:30 PM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. Last day to oppose discharge: 5/11/2021. Proofs of Claim due by 4/20/2021. (Brugger, Laurie)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 Trustee's Statement Re: #9 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICED IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: #9 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (tsef) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tsef).
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Statement of Financial Affairs; Attorney Disclosure Statement; Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; Document(s) due by 2/23/2021. (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 List of Equity Security Holders (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Debtor THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION (tsef)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Master Address List (auto)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business Subchapter V) Due by 5/10/21. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Welsh, Leonard) (eFilingID: 6930993) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tsef).
February 9, 2021 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 367312, eFilingID: 6930993) (auto)

Search for this case: THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION
Represented By: Leonard K. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jorge A. Gaitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Lisa A. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?