Sunergy California LLC v. Depcom Power, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sunergy California LLC
Defendant: Depcom Power, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021ap02015
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Payment Due as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (shbs)
March 2, 2021 Adversary Proceeding Fee Paid ($350.00, Receipt Number: 367819, eFilingID: 6937461) (auto)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Payment Due in the amount of $350 RE: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 21-02015 by Sunergy California LLC against Depcom Power, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6937461) (dpas) (admin)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Support Document/Blank Summons in Adversary Proceeding Re: #1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Sunergy California LLC (dpas)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (dpas)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (dpas)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Copy of Summons Issued Re: #1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 5/12/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (dpas)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (dpas)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 21-02015 by Sunergy California LLC against Depcom Power, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6937461) (dpas)

Search for this case: Sunergy California LLC v. Depcom Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depcom Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunergy California LLC
Represented By: Rosendo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?