Sunergy California LLC
Debtor: Sunergy California LLC
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Not Classified By Court: DEPCOM Power, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, DHD Enterprise Corp., Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc. and Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc.
Trustee: Jeffrey Perea
Case Number: 2:2021bk20172
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 267 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 9/29/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
September 1, 2021 Filing 266 Civil Minutes -- Motion Denied Re: #89 - Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9] (auto)
September 1, 2021 Filing 265 Civil Minutes -- Motion Denied Re: #206 - Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] (auto)
August 27, 2021 Filing 264 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending 07/31/2021 (bsof)
August 27, 2021 Filing 263 Certificate/Proof of Service of #258 Motion/Application to Employ Conway MacKenzie, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [NH-3], #259 Declaration (dpas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 262 Certificate/Proof of Service of #256 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory C Nuti as Attorney(s) [NH-2], #257 Declaration (dpas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 261 Certificate/Proof of Service of #260 Status Conference Statement (dpas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 260 Status Conference Statement Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Trustee Jeffrey Perea (dpas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 259 Declaration of Jeffrey C Perea in support of #258 Motion/Application to Employ Conway MacKenzie, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [NH-3] (dpas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 258 Motion/Application to Employ Conway MacKenzie, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [NH-3] Filed by Trustee Jeffrey Perea (dpas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 256 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory C Nuti as Attorney(s) [NH-2] Filed by Trustee Jeffrey Perea (dpas)
August 24, 2021 Filing 257 Declaration of Gregory C Nuti in support of #256 Motion/Application to Employ Gregory C Nuti as Attorney(s) [NH-2] (dpas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 255 Amended #254 Order on Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Order Granting #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 253 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #242 - Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (auto)
August 16, 2021 Filing 252 Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor MP Holdings, LP Re: #241 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Order Denying #238 Motion/Application for Stay Pending Appeal [RG-18] (dpas)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order Granting #241 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 250 Certificate/Proof of Service of #241 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [NH-1], #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1], #243 Declaration, #244 Declaration, #245 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 248 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
August 13, 2021 Filing 247 Certificate/Proof of Service of #246 Opposition/Objection [RG-18] (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 246 Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #238 Motion/Application for Stay Pending Appeal [RG-18] (dpas) Modified on 8/13/2021 (dpas).
August 13, 2021 Filing 245 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 244 Declaration of Jeffrey Perea in support of #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 243 Declaration of Gregory C Nuti in support of #241 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [NH-1], #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] Filed by Trustee Jeffrey Perea (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Filing 241 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [NH-1] Filed by Trustee Jeffrey Perea (dpas)
August 13, 2021 Hearing Re: #242 Motion/Application to Extend Time [NH-1] to be held on 8/16/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (dpas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 240 Trustee's Approval Re: #231 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (dpas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 239 Declaration of Rosendo Gonzalez in support of #238 Motion/Application for Stay Pending Appeal [RG-18] Re: (dpas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 238 Motion/Application for Stay Pending Appeal [RG-18] Re: #222 Order on Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (dpas)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Order Granting #229 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1]. Jeffrey Perea added to the case. (dpas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 236 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 235 Certificate of Notice of Appeal [DB-4] Re: #233 Notice of Appeal (dpas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 234 Transmittal to District Court in Sacramento [DB-4] Re: #233 Notice of Appeal (dpas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 233 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court [DB-4] Re: #222 Order on Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee (Fee Paid $298) (eFilingID: 7003961) (dpas)
August 10, 2021 Appeal Fee Paid ($298.00, Receipt Number: 371147, eFilingID: 7003961) (auto)
August 6, 2021 Filing 232 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #229 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1], #230 Declaration, #231 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (dpas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 231 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (dpas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 230 Declaration of Jeffrey C Perea Re: #229 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1] (dpas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 229 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [UST-1] Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (dpas)
July 31, 2021 Filing 224 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 223 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
July 28, 2021 Filing 228 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #185 - Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (auto)
July 28, 2021 Filing 227 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15]; Hearing to be held on 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
July 28, 2021 Filing 226 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
July 28, 2021 Filing 225 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order Granting #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4]. (pdes)
July 28, 2021 Filing 221 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #185 - Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (auto)
July 26, 2021 Filing 220 Certificate/Proof of Service of #219 Opposition/Objection [RG-15] (isaf)
July 26, 2021 Filing 219 Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] (isaf)
July 26, 2021 Filing 218 Certificate/Proof of Service of #217 Response/Reply [DB-4] (isaf)
July 26, 2021 Filing 217 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #211 Opposition/Objection [DB-4] (isaf)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order Granting #215 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [RG-16] (msts)
July 22, 2021 Filing 215 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [RG-16] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (msts)
July 22, 2021 Contacted Attorney Rosendo Gonzalez on 7/22/21 regarding Failure to Submit a Proposed Order or Notice of Hearing Re: #215 Motion/Application to Shorten Time [RG-16] (msts)
July 21, 2021 Filing 214 Request for Judicial Notice Re: #211 Opposition/Objection [DB-4] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (smis)
July 21, 2021 Filing 213 Declaration of Rosendo Gonzalez in support of #211 Opposition/Objection [DB-4] (smis)
July 21, 2021 Filing 212 Declaration of Han Lu in support of #211 Opposition/Objection [DB-4] (smis)
July 21, 2021 Filing 211 Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC Re: #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (smis)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order Granting #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (smis)
July 19, 2021 Filing 209 Declaration of ROSENDO GONZALEZ in support of #206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] (ltrf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 208 Declaration of Han Lu in support of #206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] (ltrf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 207 Notice of Hearing Re: #206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] to be held on 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltrf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 206 Motion/Application to Borrow [RG-15] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (ltrf)
July 16, 2021 Filing 202 Certificate/Proof of Service of #199 Amended Notice of Hearing, Order Setting Briefing Schedule [DB-4] (lbef)
July 16, 2021 Filing 201 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending 06/30/21 (lbef)
July 15, 2021 Filing 200 Certificate/Proof of Service of #199 Amended Notice of Hearing [DB-4] (lbef)
July 15, 2021 Filing 199 Amended Notice of Hearing Re: #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] to be held on 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (lbef)
July 14, 2021 Filing 205 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #175 - Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (auto)
July 14, 2021 Filing 204 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
July 14, 2021 Filing 203 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order Granting #195 Ex Parte Motion/Application to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [DB-5] (lbef)
July 13, 2021 Filing 197 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #195 Motion/Application to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [DB-5] (dpas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 196 Opposition/Objection Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC Re: #195 Motion/Application to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [DB-5] (dpas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 195 Motion/Application to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Chapter 11 Trustee [DB-5] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 194 Certificate/Proof of Service of #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4], #186 Notice of Hearing, #187 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #188 Request for Judicial Notice, #189 Declaration, #190 Declaration, #191 Exhibit(s) (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 193 Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 192 Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 191 Exhibit(s) in support of #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 190 Declaration of Paul R Gaus in support of #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 189 Declaration of Jamie P Dreher in support of #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 188 Request for Judicial Notice Re: #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 187 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 186 Notice of Hearing Re: #185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] to be held on 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (dpas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 185 Motion/Application to Appoint Trustee [DB-4] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (dpas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 184 Certificate/Proof of Service of #183 Response/Reply [TF-1] (dpas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 183 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., DHD Enterprise Corp., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc., Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc., XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (dpas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 182 Amended Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (dpas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 181 Certificate/Proof of Service of #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1], #176 Notice of Hearing, #177 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #178 Declaration, #179 Exhibit(s) (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 180 Certificate/Proof of Service of #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1], #176 Notice of Hearing, #177 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #178 Declaration, #179 Exhibit(s) (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 179 Exhibit(s) in support of #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 178 Declaration of Kathleen Towne in support of #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 177 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 176 Notice of Hearing Re: #175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] to be held on 7/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 175 Motion/Application Allowing Payment of Post-Petition Leasehold Obligations [TF-1] Filed by Creditor MP Holdings, LP (jbrm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 174 Notice of Withdrawal Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10] (jbrm)
June 15, 2021 Filing 173 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending May 2021 (fdis)
June 12, 2021 Filing 172 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
June 12, 2021 Filing 171 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
June 10, 2021 Filing 165 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 163 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 170 Civil Minutes -- Motion Removed from calendar Re: #120 - Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez (auto)
June 9, 2021 Filing 169 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: #123 Motion/Application for Compensation [FH-1] by the Law Office of RKF Global PLLC Special Counsel(s) SUBMITTED / UNDER ADVISEMENT (ltas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 168 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 7/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 167 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10]; Hearing to be held on 7/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 166 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 7/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Order on #123 Motion/Application for Compensation [FH-1] (dpas) Modified on 6/10/2021 (dpas).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order on #120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] (dpas)
June 7, 2021 Update Transcript Deadlines Re: #73 Transcript/Notice of Filing of Official Transcript, #74 Transcript/Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (dnes)
June 4, 2021 Filing 161 Certificate/Proof of Service of #160 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (dpas)
June 4, 2021 Filing 160 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc. (dpas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 159 Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC Re: #123 Motion/Application for Compensation [FH-1] by the Law Office of RKF Global PLLC Special Counsel(s) (dpas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 158 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor SolareAmerica (mpem)
May 26, 2021 Filing 157 Civil Minutes -- Motion Submitted Re: #120 - Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez (admin)
May 26, 2021 Filing 156 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10]; Hearing to be held on 6/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 155 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 6/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 154 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 6/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
May 21, 2021 Filing 153 Stipulated Order Approving/Granting #146 Stipulation for Relief from Automatic Stay for DEPCOM Power, Inc. [ RG-13] (ltrf)
May 19, 2021 Filing 152 Certificate/Proof of Service of #134 Joinder, #136 Joinder [FH-1] (fdis)
May 19, 2021 Filing 151 Notice of Continued Hearing Re: #120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez to be held on 6/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (rlos)
May 19, 2021 Filing 150 Notice of Continued Hearing Re: #120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez to be held on 6/9/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (rlos)
May 19, 2021 Filing 146 Stipulation for Relief from Automatic Stay with DEPCOM Power, Inc. [RG-13] (rlos)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order Granting #141 Motion/Application for Examination [DB-3] (rlos)
May 18, 2021 Filing 144 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending April 2021 (mpem)
May 17, 2021 Filing 143 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #141 Motion/Application for Examination [DB-3], #142 Declaration (mgrs)
May 17, 2021 Filing 142 Declaration of Jamie P. Dreher in support of #141 Motion/Application for Examination [DB-3] (mgrs)
May 17, 2021 Filing 141 Motion/Application for Examination [DB-3] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (mgrs)
May 17, 2021 Adversary Proceeding 2:21-ap-2015 Closed (mgrs)
May 13, 2021 Filing 140 Certificate/Proof of Service of #127 Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (dpas)
May 13, 2021 Filing 139 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 5/12/2021 11:31:13 AM ]. File Size [ 3889 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:12 ]. (admin).
May 13, 2021 Filing 138 Notice of Withdrawal [FH-1] Re: #134 Joinder (dpas)
May 13, 2021 Filing 137 Notice of Withdrawal [RG-12] Re: #133 Joinder (dpas)
May 13, 2021 Filing 136 Corrected Joinder to #131 Opposition/Objection [FH-1] Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 149 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10]; Hearing to be held on 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 148 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 147 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 135 Joinder to #129 Response/Reply [RG-12] Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 134 Joinder to #131 Opposition/Objection [FH-1] Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 133 Joinder to #129 Response/Reply [RG-12] Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 132 Certificate/Proof of Service of #131 Opposition/Objection [FH-1] (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 131 Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #123 Motion/Application for Compensation [FH-1] by the Law Office of RKF Global PLLC Special Counsel(s) (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 130 Certificate/Proof of Service of #129 Response/Reply [RG-12] (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 129 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez (dpas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 128 Notice Of Deadline For Filing Claims In This Case Re: #22 Amended Chapter 11 Meeting Notice [RG-11] (lbef)
May 12, 2021 Filing 127 Amended Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (lbef)
May 11, 2021 Filing 126 Amended Master Address List (dpas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 125 Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $32) (eFilingID: 6968718) (dpas)
May 11, 2021 Amendment Fee Paid ($32.00, Receipt Number: 369342, eFilingID: 6968718) (auto)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order Granting #84 Motion/Application To Pay [RG-8] (shbs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 123 Motion/Application for Compensation [FH-1] by the Law Office of RKF Global PLLC Special Counsel(s) Filed by Special Counsel Daniel T. Fahner (shbs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 122 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending March 2021 (shbs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 121 Notice of Hearing Re: #120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez to be held on 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 120 Motion/Application for Compensation [RG-12] by the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. Debtors Attorney(s). Filed by Rosendo Gonzalez (shbs)
April 23, 2021 Contacted Rosendo Gonzalez from the Law Office of Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. on 04/23/21 regarding incorrectly submitted Order. Replacement Order requested Re: #84 Motion/Application to Pay [RG-8] (shbs)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order Granting #59 Motion/Application to Employ Daniel T. Fahner [RG-7] (shbs)
April 21, 2021 Filing 119 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #84 - Motion/Application to Pay [RG-8] (admin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 118 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9]; Hearing to be held on 5/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 117 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10]; Hearing to be held on 5/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 116 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 5/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order Granting #109 Motion/Application to Employ Dundon Advisers, LLC [DB-2] (shbs)
April 20, 2021 Filing 113 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending March 2021 (shbs)
April 19, 2021 Filing 112 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #109 Motion/Application to Employ Dundon Advisers, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [DB-2], #110 Declaration, #111 Exhibit(s) (shbs)
April 19, 2021 Filing 111 Exhibit(s) in support of #109 Motion/Application to Employ Dundon Advisers, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [DB-2] (shbs)
April 19, 2021 Filing 110 Declaration of Matthew J. Dundon in support of #109 Motion/Application to Employ Dundon Advisers, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [DB-2] (shbs)
April 19, 2021 Filing 109 Motion/Application to Employ Dundon Advisers, LLC as Financial Adviser(s) [DB-2] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (shbs)
April 13, 2021 Filing 108 Notice of Deadline for Filing Claims in this Case [RG-11] (shbs)
April 9, 2021 Filing 107 Notice of Continuance of Hearing Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10] (shbs)
April 9, 2021 Filing 106 Notice of Continuance of Hearing Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9] (shbs)
April 8, 2021 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (shbs)
April 7, 2021 Filing 104 Certificate/Proof of Service of #103 Response/Reply [RG-8] (shbs)
April 7, 2021 Filing 103 Response/Reply Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. Re: #84 Motion/Application to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-8] (shbs)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order Granting #98 Motion/Application to Employ Jamie P. Dreher [DB-1] (shbs)
April 6, 2021 Filing 101 Limited Opposition/Objection Filed by Creditor MP Holdings, LP Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9] (shbs)
April 2, 2021 Filing 100 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #98 Motion/Application to Employ Jamie P. Dreher as Attorney(s) [DB-1], #99 Declaration (shbs)
April 2, 2021 Filing 99 Declaration of Jamie P. Dreher in support of #98 Motion/Application to Employ Jamie P. Dreher as Attorney(s) [DB-1] (shbs)
April 2, 2021 Filing 98 Motion/Application to Employ Jamie P. Dreher as Attorney(s) [DB-1] Filed by Creditor Committees DEPCOM Power, Inc., Edges Electrical Group, LLC, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (shbs)
March 30, 2021 Filing 97 Amended Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule E/F Non-Individual (shbs)
March 30, 2021 Filing 96 Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $32) (eFilingID: 6950974) (shbs)
March 30, 2021 Amendment Fee Paid ($32.00, Receipt Number: 368432, eFilingID: 6950974) (auto)
March 24, 2021 Filing 95 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #77 - Motion/Application for Examination and For Production of Documents [FH-1] (admin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 94 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #59 - Motion/Application to Employ Daniel T. Fahner as Special Counsel [RG-7] (admin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 93 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 92 Notice of Hearing Re: #91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10] to be held on 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
March 18, 2021 Filing 91 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-10] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
March 18, 2021 Filing 90 Notice of Hearing Re: #89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9] to be held on 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
March 18, 2021 Filing 89 Motion/Application to Assume Lease or Executory Contract [RG-9] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
March 17, 2021 Filing 88 Certificate/Proof of Service of #86 Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (shbs)
March 17, 2021 Filing 87 Certificate/Proof of Service of #86 Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (shbs)
March 17, 2021 Filing 86 Notice of Appointment of Unsecured Creditors' Committee (shbs)
March 15, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing Re: #84 Motion/Application to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-8] to be held on 4/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
March 15, 2021 Filing 84 Motion/Application to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-8] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
March 12, 2021 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Aluko America Inc. (shbs)
March 12, 2021 Filing 82 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending February 2021 (shbs)
March 11, 2021 Filing 81 Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (shbs)
March 10, 2021 Filing 80 Certificate/Proof of Service of #77 Motion/Application for Examination and For Production of Documents [FH-1], #78 Notice of Hearing, #79 Declaration (shbs)
March 10, 2021 Filing 79 Declaration of Jennifer C. Hayes in support of #77 Motion/Application for Examination and For Production of Documents [FH-1] (shbs)
March 10, 2021 Filing 78 Notice of Hearing Re: #77 Motion/Application for Examination and For Production of Documents [FH-1] to be held on 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
March 10, 2021 Filing 77 Motion/Application for Examination and For Production of Documents [FH-1] Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (shbs)
March 6, 2021 Filing 76 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
March 6, 2021 Filing 75 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
March 3, 2021 Filing 74 Transcript regarding hearing held on 02/24/21; Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/10/2021. Redaction Request Due By 3/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/5/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/1/2021. (shbs)
March 3, 2021 Filing 73 Transcript regarding hearing held on 02212021; Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/10/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/5/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/1/2021. (Williams, Janice)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order Granting #8 Motion/Application to Employ [RG-1] (shbs)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order Granting #70 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice (shbs)
March 2, 2021 Filing 70 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Hyun Suk Choi (shbs)
March 1, 2021 Filing 69 On 02/05/2021, an electronic notification sent to Josiah M. Prendergast at jprendergast@wjhattorneys.com was returned to the Court as undeliverable. As a result, the Clerks Office deleted this email from our e-Filing system, and, on 03/01/2021, mailed the attached letter to Josiah M. Prendergast at his/her primary postal address. (admin)
March 1, 2021 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was held on 02/25/21. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; 341 Meeting Concluded as to Debtor. Booker Carmichael, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. (Brugger, Laurie)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Granting #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application [RG-3] (jbrm)
February 25, 2021 Filing 65 Adversary Case 21-2015. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) : Complaint 21-02015 by Sunergy California LLC against Depcom Power, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (mgrs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 64 Amended Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule E/F Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (mgrs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 63 Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $32) (eFilingID: 6937419) (mgrs)
February 25, 2021 Amendment Fee Paid ($32.00, Receipt Number: 367669, eFilingID: 6937419) (auto)
February 24, 2021 Filing 68 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
February 24, 2021 Filing 67 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #8 - Motion/Application to Employ Rosendo Gonzalez as Attorney(s) [RG-1] (admin)
February 21, 2021 Filing 62 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Filing of Transcript and of Deadlines Related to Redaction and Restriction as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 61 Declaration of Thomas Rosenberg in support of #59 Motion/Application to Employ Daniel T. Fahner as Special Counsel [RG-7] (msam)
February 19, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Hearing Re: #59 Motion/Application to Employ Daniel T. Fahner as Special Counsel [RG-7] to be held on 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (msam)
February 19, 2021 Filing 59 Motion/Application to Employ Daniel T. Fahner as Special Counsel [RG-7] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (msam)
February 19, 2021 Filing 58 Transcript regarding hearing held on 02092021; Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as transmitted to BNC for Service. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/26/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/22/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/20/2021. (Williams, Janice)
February 18, 2021 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (vcaf)
February 15, 2021 Filing 56 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending January 31, 2021 (shbs)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting #40 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay Yingfa, Inc. as a Critical Vendor for a Pre-Petition Debt [RG-6] (shbs) .
February 12, 2021 Filing 54 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #40 - Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] (admin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 53 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #11 - Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] (admin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 52 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Changzhou Almaden Co. Ltd. (kwis)
February 11, 2021 Filing 50 Declaration of Han Lu in support of #40 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] (kwis)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order Granting #35 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application [RG-5] (kwis)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Granting #12 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application (kwis)
February 9, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditors XPO Customs Clearance Solutions, LLC, XPO GF America, Inc, XPO Global Forwarding, Inc. (jlns)
February 9, 2021 Filing 46 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #40 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6]; Hearing to be held on 2/12/2021 at 01:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 45 Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: #35 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-5] GRANTED (ltas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 44 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3]; Hearing to be held on 2/12/2021 at 01:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 43 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756); Status Conference now to be held on 2/12/2021 at 01:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Cypress Creak EPC, LLC (lars)
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Hearing Re: #40 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] to be held on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (lars)
February 8, 2021 Filing 40 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (lars)
February 8, 2021 Filing 39 ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR-NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Notice of Hearing Re: 38 Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] to be held on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (lars) Modified on 2/8/2021 (lars).
February 8, 2021 Filing 38 ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR-NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Motion/Application to Pay [RG-6] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (lars) Modified on 2/8/2021 (lars).
February 5, 2021 Filing 37 Supplemental Declaration of Han Lu and In Jun Jeong in support of #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] (shbs)
February 5, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Hearing Re: #35 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-5] to be held on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
February 5, 2021 Filing 35 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Various Pre-Petition Debts [RG-5] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
February 2, 2021 Filing 34 Certificate/Proof of Service of #33 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (shbs)
February 2, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Coldwell Solar 1, LLC (shbs)
February 2, 2021 Filing 30 Case Status Report Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
January 30, 2021 Filing 29 Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
January 30, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
January 30, 2021 Filing 27 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Granting #19 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Employees' Salary (and Related Payroll Taxes and Cost) [RG-4] (shbs)
January 29, 2021 Filing 25 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #19 - Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Employees' Salary (and Related Payroll Taxes and Costs) [RG-4] (admin)
January 28, 2021 Filing 24 Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $32) (eFilingID: 6926491) (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 23 Amended Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule E/F Schedule G Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Amendment Fee Paid ($32.00, Receipt Number: 367114, eFilingID: 6926491) (auto)
January 28, 2021 Filing 22 Amended Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/25/2021 at 10:00 AM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. (Brugger, Laurie)
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 Amend Order Re: #5 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Re: #19 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Employees' Salary (and Related Payroll Taxes and Costs) [RG-4] to be held on 1/29/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 19 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Employees' Salary (and Related Payroll Taxes and Costs) [RG-4] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Continued Hearing Re: #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] to be held on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. Last day to oppose discharge: 4/26/2021. Proofs of Claim due by 5/25/2021. (Brugger, Laurie)
January 27, 2021 Filing 32 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re: #12 - Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amounts Due to Utility Companies for Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and Deeming Utility Companies Adequate Protection with Payment of Security Depos (admin)
January 27, 2021 Filing 31 Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re: #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3]; Hearing to be held on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (ltas)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Borrego Solar Systems, Inc. (shbs)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Re: #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] to be held on 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Re: #12 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amounts Due to Utility Companies for Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and Deeming Utility Companies Adequate Protection with Payment of Security Deposit to be held on 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
January 26, 2021 Hearing Re: #11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] to be held on 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs)
January 26, 2021 Hearing Re: #12 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amounts Due to Utility Companies for Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and Deeming Utility Companies Adequate Protection with Payment of Security Deposit [RG-2] to be held on 1/27/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shbs) .
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor DEPCOM Power, Inc. (shbs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amounts Due to Utility Companies for Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and Deeming Utility Companies Adequate Protection with Payment of Security Deposit [RG-2] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 Chapter 11 First Day Motion/Application Seeking Authorization for Payment of Pre-Petition Amount Due to Vendor Aluko America, Inc. [RG-3] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shbs)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 Change of Mailing Address for Creditor Aluko America Inc (shes)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Hearing Re: #8 Motion/Application to Employ Rosendo Gonzalez as Attorney(s) [RG-1] to be held on 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (shes)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 Motion/Application to Employ Rosendo Gonzalez as Attorney(s) [RG-1] Filed by Debtor Sunergy California LLC (shes)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor MP Holdings, LP (shes)
January 24, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition to be held on 2/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (mgrs)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (shbs)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Verification and Master Address List Re: #2 Notice of Incomplete Filing (shbs)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Verification and Master Address List due by 1/27/2021; (shes)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (See Page #45 of Voluntary Petition) (shes)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (Gonzalez, Rosendo) (eFilingID: 6922756)
January 20, 2021 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 366927, eFilingID: 6922756) (auto)

Search for this case: Sunergy California LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Sunergy California LLC
Represented By: Rosendo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Booker T. Carmichael
Represented By: Edmund Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEPCOM Power, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: XPO Global Forwarding, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Edges Electrical Group, LLC
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DHD Enterprise Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Seraphim Solar USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sunrise Energy Solution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jeffrey Perea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?