Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc.
Debtor: Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc.
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Trustee: Walter R. Dahl
Case Number: 2:2024bk21595
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 80 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 79 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 78 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 77 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 76 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 75 Support Document Re: #74 Small Business Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (msts)
June 7, 2024 Filing 74 Debtor-In-Possession Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending 04/30/24 (msts)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order to Continue Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 6/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B (svim)
May 30, 2024 Filing 68 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. (Fee Not Paid $0.00) (pdes) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 6/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B (dhes)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Approving #19 Stipulation [MCF-3] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Approving #15 Stipulation [MCF-2] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Approving #14 Stipulation [MCF-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
May 30, 2024 Filing 64 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [05/28/2024 11:10:00 AM]. File Size [ 2174 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:11 ]. (auto).
May 28, 2024 Filing 72 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Stipulation Approved Re: #20 - Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1] (auto)
May 28, 2024 Filing 71 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Stipulation Approved Re: #24 - Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2] (auto)
May 28, 2024 Filing 70 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Stipulation Approved Re: #28 - Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3] (auto)
May 28, 2024 Filing 69 Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted, Resolved without Oral Argument Re: #37 - Motion/Application to Employ Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP as Accountant(s) [MCF-5] #37 - Motion/Application for Compensation [MCF-5] for Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP, Accountant(s) (auto)
May 28, 2024 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was held on 05/23/24. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; 341 Meeting Concluded as to Debtor. Jason Blumberg, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. (Brugger, Laurie)
May 24, 2024 Filing 63 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 23, 2024 Filing 62 Declaration of Jeremy Soiland (svim)
May 23, 2024 Filing 61 Certificate/Proof of Service of #60 Declaration [MCF-1] (svim)
May 23, 2024 Filing 60 Declaration of Michael C. Fallon Re: #48 Opposition/Objection [MCF-1] (svim)
May 22, 2024 Filing 59 Certificate/Proof of Service of #54 Response/Reply [MCF-3] (svim)
May 22, 2024 Filing 58 Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust fund, et al. (svim)
May 22, 2024 Filing 57 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (svim)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Granting #37 Motion/Application to Employ [MCF-5] (svim)
May 21, 2024 Motion/Application for Compensation, Document Number #37, Terminated. See #56 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [MCF-5] (svim)
May 21, 2024 Filing 55 Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. Re: #49 Opposition/Objection [MCF-2] (svim)
May 21, 2024 Filing 54 Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. Re: #50 Opposition/Objection [MCF-3] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 53 Certificate/Proof of Service of #50 Opposition/Objection [MCF-3] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 52 Certificate/Proof of Service of #49 Opposition/Objection [MCF-2] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 51 Certificate/Proof of Service of #48 Opposition/Objection [MCF-1] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 50 Opposition/Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis Re: #28 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 49 Opposition/Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis Re: #24 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2] (svim)
May 14, 2024 Filing 48 Opposition/Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis Re: #20 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1] (svim)
May 13, 2024 Filing 45 Certificate/Proof of Service of #44 Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report [CAE-1] (svim)
May 13, 2024 Filing 44 Subchapter V Pre-Status Conference Report [CAE-1] #8 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof (svim)
May 13, 2024 Filing 43 Balance Sheet (svim)
May 13, 2024 Filing 42 Tax Document(s) for the Year(s) 2021 (svim)
May 10, 2024 Filing 41 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 10, 2024 Filing 40 Certificate/Proof of Service of #37 Motion/Application to Employ Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP as Accountant(s) [MCF-5], #37 Motion/Application for Compensation [MCF-5] for Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP, Accountant(s), #38 Notice of Hearing, #39 Declaration (svim)
May 10, 2024 Filing 39 Declaration of Timothy McGaughey in support of #37 Motion/Application to Employ Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP as Accountant(s) [MCF-5], #37 Motion/Application for Compensation [MCF-5] for Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP, Accountant(s) (svim)
May 10, 2024 Filing 38 Notice of Hearing Re: #37 Motion/Application to Employ Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP as Accountant(s) [MCF-5], #37 Motion/Application for Compensation [MCF-5] for Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP, Accountant(s) to be held on 5/28/2024 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (svim)
May 10, 2024 Filing 37 Motion/Application for Compensation [MCF-5] for Baldwin, McGaughey & Co. LLP, Accountant(s) Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
May 8, 2024 Filing 36 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (svim)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting #33 Motion/Application to Employ Michael Fallon [MCF-4] (svim)
May 1, 2024 Filing 34 Declaration of Michael C. Fallon Re: #33 Motion/Application to Employ Michael C. Fallon as Attorney(s) [MCF-4] (svim)
May 1, 2024 Filing 33 Motion/Application to Employ Michael C. Fallon as Attorney(s) [MCF-4] Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Approving #19 Stipulation [MCF-3] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate/Proof of Service of #28 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3], #29 Notice of Hearing, #30 Declaration (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 30 Declaration of Jeremy Soiland in support of #28 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3] (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 29 Notice of Hearing Re: #28 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3] to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 28 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-3] Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate/Proof of Service of #24 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2], #25 Notice of Hearing, #26 Declaration (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 26 Declaration of Jeremy Soiland in support of #24 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2] (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Re: #24 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2] to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 24 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-2] Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate/Proof of Service of #20 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1], #21 Notice of Hearing, #22 Declaration (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 22 Declaration of Jeremy Soiland in support of #20 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1] (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing Re: #20 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1] to be held on 5/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B. (svim)
April 30, 2024 Filing 20 Motion/Application for Order Approving Cash Collateral Stipulation [MCF-1] Filed by Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 29, 2024 Filing 19 Stipulation for Use of Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection [MCF-3] Filed by Creditor Internal Revenue Service, Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Approving #15 Stipulation [MCF-2] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
April 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Approving #14 Stipulation [MCF-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (svim)
April 26, 2024 Filing 47 Balance Sheet (tsef)
April 26, 2024 Filing 46 Tax Document(s) for the Year(s) 2021 (tsef)
April 26, 2024 Filing 16 ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Balance Sheet (tsef) Modified on 5/14/2024 (tsef).
April 24, 2024 Filing 15 Stipulation for Use of Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection [MCF-2] Filed by Creditor Employment Development Department, Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 Stipulation for Use of Cash Collateral and for Adequate Protection [MCF-1] Filed by Creditor Commercial Credit Corp. Inc., Debtor Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc. (svim)
April 24, 2024 Filing 13 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 Verification and Master Equity Security Holders Address List (svim)
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/23/2024 at 02:00 PM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. Last day to oppose discharge: 7/22/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/26/2024. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 7/22/2024. (Bharat, Shane)
April 21, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 21, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Mailing of Order Setting Status Conference as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof [CAE-1] as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Status Conference to be held on 5/28/2024 at 02:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 32, Department B ; Pre-Status Report Due By 5/14/2024. (svim)
April 19, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (svim)
April 19, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Paid ($1,738.00, Receipt Number: 20001438 by DP) (auto)
April 19, 2024 Filing Fee Paid (Fee Paid $1738.00 ) Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (dpas)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (svim)
April 17, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (svim)
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 Amended List of Equity Security Holders (svim)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 Master Address List (auto)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. A copy of this notice was returned to the attorney for the debtor(s) at the address listed in the courts records (the documents were not filed electronically). (pdes)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (pdes) See Page #36 of Voluntary Petition

Search for this case: Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Rock Crushing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jason M. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Walter R. Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?