Swanston Oak, LLC
Debtor: Swanston Oak, LLC
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Case Number: 2:2024bk21710
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Filing 34 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 6/20/2024 11:42:36 AM ]. File Size [ 2515 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:59 ]. (auto).
June 18, 2024 Filing 33 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending 5/31/2024 (tsef)
June 18, 2024 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was held on 06/03/24. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; 341 Meeting Concluded as to Debtor. Jorge A. Gaitan, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. (Gaitan, Jorge)
June 6, 2024 Filing 32 Status Conference Statement [CAE-1] Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Swanston Oak, LLC (tsef)
May 16, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case to Equity Security Holders as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 14, 2024 Filing 29 BNC Service of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case to Equity Security Holders as Required by Local Bankruptcy Rule 2002-2 as transmitted to BNC for service. (dnes)
May 13, 2024 Filing 30 Debtor-In-Possession Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending 4/30/2024 (tsef)
May 11, 2024 Filing 28 Certificate of Mailing of Order to Show Cause - Failure to Pay Fees as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 9, 2024 Filing 27 Support Document Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Swanston Oak, LLC (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 26 Declaration of Michael Moser (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 25 Verification and Master Equity Security Holders Address List (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 24 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 23 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 22 Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 21 Schedule H Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 20 Schedule G Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 19 Schedule E/F Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 18 Schedule D Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 17 Schedule A/B Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing 16 Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Non-Individual (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Addition of Equity Stockholders (auto)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Pay Fees as Transmitted to BNC for Service. Hearing to be held on 6/20/2024 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E. (tsef)
May 9, 2024 Filing Fee Paid (Fee Paid $1738.00 ) Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (rlos)
May 9, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Paid ($1,738.00, Receipt Number: 20001599 by RL) (auto)
May 8, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 Amended Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/3/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. (Bharat, Shane)
May 4, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/24/2024 at 09:30 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. Last day to oppose discharge: 7/23/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 8/22/2024. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 7/23/2024. (Bharat, Shane)
May 1, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Payment Due as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (tsef)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Payment Due in the amount of $1738 RE: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. (Fee Not Paid $0.00) (dpas) (admin)
April 28, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof [CAE-1] as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Status Conference to be held on 6/20/2024 at 11:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 33, Department E (tsef)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (tsef)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Master Address List (auto)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. A copy of this notice was returned to the attorney for the debtor(s) via hand delivery. (dpas)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. (Fee Not Paid $0.00) (dpas)

Search for this case: Swanston Oak, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Swanston Oak, LLC
Represented By: Karl A. Schweikert
Represented By: Karl Schweikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jorge A. Gaitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?