Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC
Debtor: Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Case Number: 2:2024bk21899
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Closing Case where Case has been Dismissed (svim)
May 15, 2024 Filing 18 Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of #15 Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 13, 2024 Filing 16 BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (svim)
May 13, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Entry of Order as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: #14 Order Granting #8 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case (svim) (svim)
May 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting #8 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case (svim)
May 10, 2024 Filing 13 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC (svim)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 8, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/11/2024 at 11:00 AM, see Notice for Location of Meeting. Last day to oppose discharge: 8/12/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/9/2024. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 8/12/2024. (Brugger, Laurie)
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate/Proof of Service of #8 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case (svim)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC (svim)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (svim)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (svim)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Debtor Concerning Legal Representation (rlos)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (rlos)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 Master Address List (auto)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. A copy of this notice was returned to the pro se debtor(s) via hand delivery. (rlos)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (rlos)
May 2, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Paid ($1,738.00, Receipt Number: 20001585 by RL) (auto)

Search for this case: Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Thirty Three Thirty Three, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jason M. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?