Mini Mania Inc.
Debtor: Mini Mania Inc.
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk22456
Filed: June 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2024 Filing 31 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
June 7, 2024 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (kwis)
June 7, 2024 Filing 29 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 6/7/2024 11:15:41 AM ]. File Size [ 7909 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:21:58 ]. (auto).
June 7, 2024 Filing 28 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 6/7/2024 11:00:35 AM ]. File Size [ 5467 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:11 ]. (auto).
June 6, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate/Proof of Service of #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2], #16 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing, #23 Notice of Hearing (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 26 Certificate/Proof of Service of #23 Notice of Hearing [SRF-2] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 25 Certificate/Proof of Service of #23 Notice of Hearing [SRF-2] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 24 Certificate/Proof of Service of #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 23 Notice of Hearing Re: #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] to be held on 6/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 22 Exhibit(s) Re: #19 Declaration [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 21 Declaration of Steven R Fox Re: #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 20 Exhibit(s) in support of #18 Declaration [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 19 Declaration of Matthew Fox Re: #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 18 Declaration of Shannon Wetzel Re: #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 6, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order to Set Hearing Re: #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Hearing to be held on 6/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (dpas)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order to Set Hearing Re: #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Hearing to be held on 6/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 14 Exhibit(s) in support of #13 Declaration [SRF-1] (dpas) Modified on 6/4/2024 (dpas).
June 4, 2024 Filing 13 Declaration of Jonathan Harvey in support of #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 12 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Master Equity Security Holder Address List; Document(s) due by 6/18/2024. (mgrs)
June 4, 2024 Filing 10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] Filed by Debtor Mini Mania Inc. (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 9 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] Filed by Debtor Mini Mania Inc. (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 Equity Security Holders Address List (mgrs)
June 4, 2024 Filing 6 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (rlos)
June 4, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (rlos)
June 4, 2024 Filing 4 Support Document/Corporate Resolution Authorizing Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Commencement Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Mini Mania Inc. (rlos)
June 4, 2024 Filing 3 Declaration of Jonathan Harvey Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (rlos)
June 4, 2024 Filing 2 Master Address List (auto)
June 4, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Steven R. Fox) (eFilingID: 7360554)
June 4, 2024 This motion/application has been filed without a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order. In order for this matter to be considered by the court, the filing party must provide a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order, except for the following types of motions proscribed by Rule 6003 which may not have orders entered within 21 days after the filing of the petition: (a) application for employment under Rule 2014;(b) motion to use, sell, lease or otherwise incur an obligation regarding property of the estate, including a motion to pay all or part of a claim that arose before the filing of the petition, but not a motion under Rule 4001;(c) motion to assume or assign an executory contract or unexpired lease in accordance with section 365. In these instances, please do not submit a proposed order to the court until 21 days after the filing of the petition. This entry is in reference to #10 Motion/Application to Pay [SRF-2] (dpas)
June 4, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 390378, eFilingID: 7360554) (auto)
June 4, 2024 Addition of Equity Stockholders (auto)
June 4, 2024 This motion/application has been filed without a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order. In order for this matter to be considered by the court, the filing party must provide a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order, except for the following types of motions proscribed by Rule 6003 which may not have orders entered within 21 days after the filing of the petition: (a) application for employment under Rule 2014;(b) motion to use, sell, lease or otherwise incur an obligation regarding property of the estate, including a motion to pay all or part of a claim that arose before the filing of the petition, but not a motion under Rule 4001;(c) motion to assume or assign an executory contract or unexpired lease in accordance with section 365. In these instances, please do not submit a proposed order to the court until 21 days after the filing of the petition. This entry is in reference to #8 Motion/Application to Use Cash Collateral [SRF-1] (dpas)

Search for this case: Mini Mania Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Mini Mania Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?