Priority Medical Supply, Inc.
Debtor: Priority Medical Supply, Inc.
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Trustee: Walter R. Dahl
Case Number: 9:2024bk90207
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 33 Certificate of Service of Tax Information/Payment Advices (vmcf)
June 13, 2024 Filing 32 Declaration of Joseph L. Lewis Re: Small Business Documents (vmcf)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order to Continue Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 8/8/2024 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (vmcf)
June 9, 2024 Filing 30 PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2024 2:00:55 PM ]. File Size [ 865 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:36 ]. (auto).
June 6, 2024 Filing 29 Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: #1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business Subchapter V) Due: 7/18/24. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (David C. Johnston) (eFilingID: 7341918) Modified on 4/19/2024 (vmcf). [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 8/8/2024 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E (mpem)
May 29, 2024 Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. The 341 Meeting was adjourned on 05/28/24. Debtor Appeared; Counsel of Record Appeared; Jorge A. Gaitan, Attorney for the U.S. Trustees Office, appeared. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/13/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. (Bharat, Shane)
May 26, 2024 Filing 28 Certificate/Proof of Service of #15 Amended Chapter 11 Meeting Notice (tsef)
May 26, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate/Proof of Service of #26 Status Report [CAE-1] (tsef)
May 26, 2024 Filing 26 Status Report [CAE-1] Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor Priority Medical Supply, Inc. (tsef)
May 26, 2024 Filing 25 Amended Verification and Master Address List (Fee Paid $34) (eFilingID: 7357162) (tjof)
May 26, 2024 Amendment Fee Paid ($34.00, Receipt Number: 390175, eFilingID: 7357162) (auto)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Granting #21 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston [DCJ-1] (vcaf)
May 20, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, #21 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-1], #22 Declaration (vcaf)
May 20, 2024 Filing 22 Declaration of David C. Johnston in support of #21 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-1] (vcaf)
May 20, 2024 Filing 21 Motion/Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney(s) [DCJ-1] Filed by Debtor Priority Medical Supply, Inc. (vcaf)
May 6, 2024 Filing 20 Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (pdes)
May 6, 2024 Filing 20 Summary of Schedules/Assets and Liabilities Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Non-Individual (pdes)
May 6, 2024 Filing 19 Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Individual (pdes)
May 6, 2024 Filing 18 Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (pdes)
May 5, 2024 Filing 17 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 4, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 3, 2024 Filing 15 Amended Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/28/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. (Bharat, Shane)
May 3, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE DELETED - REQUESTED IN ERROR. Amended Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/28/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. (Bharat, Shane) Modified on 5/3/2024 (cmcs).
May 2, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 5/28/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. Last day to oppose discharge: 7/29/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/28/2024. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 7/29/2024. (Bharat, Shane)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party #2 Notice of Incomplete Filing (vmcf)
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 Verification and Master Address List Re: #2 Notice of Incomplete Filing (vmcf)
April 29, 2024 Filing 10 List of Equity Security Holders Re: #2 Notice of Incomplete Filing (vmcf)
April 29, 2024 Filing 9 Verification and Master Equity Security Holders Address List (vmcf)
April 29, 2024 Addition of Equity Stockholders (auto)
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Mailing of Order Setting Status Conference as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
April 23, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (vmcf)
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (vcaf)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof [CAE-1] as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Status Conference to be held on 6/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Modesto Courtroom, Department E ; Pre-Status Report Due By 5/23/2024. (tjof)
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (rlos)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Verification and Master Address List due by 4/26/2024; Statement of Financial Affairs; Attorney Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2024; Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Schedule A/B - Real and Personal Property; Schedule D - Secured Creditors;Schedule E/F - Unsecured Claims; Schedule G - Exec. Contracts & Unexpired Leases; Schedule H - Codebtors; 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors; List of Equity Security Holders; Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor; Master Equity Security Holder Address List; Document(s) due by 5/3/2024. (vmcf)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business Subchapter V) Due: 7/18/24. (Fee Paid $1738.00) (David C. Johnston) (eFilingID: 7341918) Modified on 4/19/2024 (vmcf).
April 19, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 389302, eFilingID: 7341918) (auto)

Search for this case: Priority Medical Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Priority Medical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jorge A. Gaitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Walter R. Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?