Sequoia Property, et al v. USA, et al
Plaintiff: Sequoia Property and Equipment
Defendant: USA
Counter_claimant: USA, Sequoia Property and Equipment, Wanda Jean Crisp, G Mark Crisp and Rhonda Crisp
Counter_defendant: Sequoia Property and Equipment
Case Number: 1:1997cv05044
Filed: January 22, 1997
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/3/15. (Marrujo, C)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 420 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale and Distribution of Proceeds [416}, signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, MJ on 07/09/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER Granting 416 the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale and Distribution of Proceeds, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/11/12. (Verduzco, M)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER Of Judicial Sale, signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, MJ on 8/26/2011. (Fahrney, E)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER ON GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF JUDICAL SALE 405 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 25, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for 9/13/2011 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia Property, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia Property and Equipment
Represented By: John William Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: USA
Represented By: Guy Patrick Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Sequoia Property and Equipment
Represented By: John William Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Wanda Jean Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: G Mark Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rhonda Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sequoia Property and Equipment
Represented By: John William Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Guy Patrick Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?