Buford v. Wasco State Prison, et al
Case Number: 1:2001cv05192
Filed: February 16, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 244 and Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 254 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/2/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER GRANTING 245 Motion for Extension of Time To File Opposistion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/2010. (Filing Deadline: 7/16/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office To Change Plaintiff's Address Of Record To San Quentin State Prison, ORDER Striking Request For Ruling (Doc. 238 ), ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Vacate Second Scheduling, And Set Amended Motion Deadline (Docs. 235 and 237 ), Amended Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline: 06/30/2010, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/16/2009. (Scrivner, E)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ***VACATED; pursuant to ORDER 240 ***SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Send Local Rule 16-281 to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/17/2009. Plaintiff to Submit Pretrial Statement by 1/4 /2010; Defendant to Submit Pretrial Statement by 02/04/2010. Telephonic Trial Confirmation set for 3/1/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 4/20/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Flores, E)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants' Counsel to File a Response to the Court's Orde of June 22, 2009, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/3/09: Response ddl 9/23/2009.(Hellings, J)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office To Re-Serve Order, And Send Proof Of Service Form 220 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/1/2009. (Settlement Conference Statements: 5/27/2009) Enclosed: (1) Proof of Service Form (Scrivner, E)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 213 Motion for Leave to Submit Brief for Telephonic Status Conference and ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference, and Setting Telephonic Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/17/2009. TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 3/11/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Judge Sandra M. Snyder. ( Statements due by 3/6/2009) (Figueroa, O)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE, AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS COUNSEL TO ARRANGE AND INITIATE CONFERENCE CALL signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/22/2009. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/17/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder) (Figueroa, O)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 178 DISCOVERY/SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/20/2007. Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2008; Discovery due by 3/24/2008; Dispositive Motion due by 5/23/2008. (Esteves, C)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING 170 MOTION for Relief from Order and Judgment and/or Motion to Alter Judgment filed by Timothy Buford. Action is RE-OPENED and referred back to the Magistrate Judge for issuance of a scheduling order; signed by Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/07. (Robles, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buford v. Wasco State Prison, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?