Noble v. Adams, et al
Plaintiff: Steve Joseph Noble, IV
Defendant: D. Adams and D - Cuevas
Case Number: 1:2003cv05407
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DIRECTING The Clerk of The Court to (1) Enter Judgment for Defendants on The Grounds of Qualified Immunity and (2) Close The Court File 182 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/9/11. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING 165 , 166 , 168 , 169 , 170 Motions as Moot due to Vacatur of Trial Schedule and Pending Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/3/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Vacating September 16, 2009 Order And Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum As To Plaintiff's Witness, Dewayne N. Logan, CDC# T-26100 (Doc. 157 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/5/2009. (Scrivner, E)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ***VACATED; PURSUANT TO ORDER 162 ***ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Witness Dewayne N. Logan, CDC# T-21600 for trial on October 20, 2009 at 7:30 a.m., signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/16/2009. (Martin, S)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING 134 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/09/2009. (Figueroa, O)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Moving Telephonic Pretrial Conference to September 14, 2009 at 3:00p.m. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2009. ( Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii)(Figueroa, O)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING 140 141 Motions for Appointment of Counsel and Expert Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/30/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Adams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Joseph Noble, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Adams
Represented By: Constance Lee Picciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D - Cuevas
Represented By: Constance Lee Picciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?