Warren v. Shawnego, et al
Plaintiff: Carmon Warren
Defendant: J Shawnego and W - Phillips
Case Number: 1:2003cv06336
Filed: September 29, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER (1) DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Change Address of Record to CSP-Calipatria and Provide Courtesy Copies of Docket and Order 80 ; (2)ORDER DENYING 81 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/24/2013. (Martin-Gill, S) (Address changed and copies sent as directed by this order)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying 74 Motion for Relief from Judgment, With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/22/13. (Gonzalez, R)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Striking Unsigned Reply and Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days to File Signed Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/09/2013. Reply due by 5/13/2013. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Staying Action Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/2/11. CASE STAYED. (Verduzco, M)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Striking Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/21/2011. (Flores, E)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Consideration Of Untimely Opposition, Striking Opposition, And Granting Plaintiff A Thirty-Day Extension Of Time To File Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/18/2011. (Objections to F&R due by 9/22/2011)(Fahrney, E)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's 44 Motion to Dismiss be Granted; Thirty-Day Objection Period signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/11/2011. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/14/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Second 45 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/15/2011. (Flores, E)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum as Premature 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/11. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Premature Discovery Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/21/2010. (Jessen, A)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/8/2010 requiring Plaintiff to either file amended complaint or notify the court of willingness to proceed only against defendant Shawnego on due process claim. (Filing Deadline: 1/12/2011). (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Form)(Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Set Aside Judgment 22 , DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Reopen Case, and REFERRING Matter to Magistrate Judge for Screening, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/23/10. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Shawnego, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmon Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Shawnego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W - Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?