Radillo v. Lunes, et al
Case Number: 1:2004cv05353
Filed: February 27, 2004
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/15/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Advise the Court Regarding his Intention to Proceed With This Action; Response due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/11/2010. Status report or notice of voluntary dismissal due by 7/14/2010. (Bradley, A)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER To SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/20/2010. It is ORDERED that Defendant is absolved from her obligation to file a status report until such time as Plaintiff files a status report. Defendant will be granted thirty days from the date Plaintiff's status report is filed in which to file her status report. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2010. (Scrivner, E)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying 76 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/29/2009. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radillo v. Lunes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?