Hightower v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Hightower
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edward S Alemedia, N. Grannis, Gilbert R Sainz, Glenn - Douglas, M Hodges-Wilkins, Linda Rianda, Rosemarie Nelson, M - Bulanon, B Williams, Mike Knowles, E. A. Reyes, R. L. Williams, L Warren, Rick Manuel, R Hansen, A W Cobbs, R M Diaz, F S Cotes, A. Santa Cruz, D. Duvall, - Zimmerman, Arline, J. Tilton, J.A. Yates, K. Allison, Appelbaum, J. Bollard, J. Ward, D.W. Yates, D. Adams, E. McCant, Nyguen, Wu, Bhatt, Auguillera-Moreno, D. Overly, D.W. Sanchez, C. Dahlberg, J. Klarich and D. Deering
Case Number: 1:2004cv06028
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DISMISSING Action, With Prejudice, Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), And Directing Clerk Of Court To File (Doc. 191 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING 174 178 Motions to Modify Scheduling Order, GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests, and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for other Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2012. Amended Pleadings Deadline: 7/13/2012; Discovery Deadline: 9/14/2012; Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline: 11/14/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 DISCOVERY ORDER/SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/5/11: Deadline to Amend Pleadings - January 31, 2012, Discovery Cut-Off Date - April 2, 2012, Dispositive Motions Deadline - June 8, 2012. (Hellings, J)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Adopting 166 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Defendants' 151 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/18/11. 30 Day Deadline for Defendants Dr. Nyguen and Dr. Wu to Respond to Third Amended Complaint. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Rights Regarding "Bad Faith" on the Part of Defendants and 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Parties Deceased, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2011. Substitution of Parties and Service Information due within forty-five (45) days. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 151 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies; Objections Due in Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/29/2011. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 8/2/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 152 , 155 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/7/2011. (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to Notify Court whether a Settlement Conference before United States Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas would be Beneficial; Fifteen (15) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/10/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants J. Klarich, K. Nyguen, D. Deering, S. Wu, and A. Santa Cruz and that Defendant Schwarzenegger be Dismissed, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/3/2010. Defendants' Response to Third Amended Complaint Deadline: 12/6/2010. Arnold Schwarzenegger terminated.(Verduzco, M)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DENYING 146 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/13/2010. (Martin, S)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants J. Klarich, K. Nyguen, D. Deering, S. Wu, and A. Santa Cruz and that Defendant Schwarzenegger be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/2010. Referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 10/4/2010. (Verduzco, M)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Before United States Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/24/2009. Filing Deadline: 12/14/2009. (Sondheim, M)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 126 Request for Permission to Appeal signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/5/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/2009. (Sondheim, M)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 75 and 97 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and For Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/16/2009. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER ADOPTING 112 Findings and Recommendations, and DENYING Plaintiff's 104 Request for Preliminary Injunction to Direct Access to Law Library signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/9/2009. (Figueroa, O)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/29/2009 adopting 116 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 69 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing claims against Defendant, P. Figueroa without prejudice.(Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/10/2009, Recommending to Dismiss Claim Against Defendant Figueroa. Matter referred to Judge Wanger. (Objections to F&R due by 8/12/2009) (Figueroa, O)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER for Plaintiff's Volume II of Exhibits to be Filed and Extending Defendant's Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/2/2009. ( Filing Deadline: 7/31/2009)(Figueroa, O)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 84 First MOTION for Sixty-Day EXTENSION of TIME to Oppose Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/12/2009. Opposition due by 3/17/2009. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Schwarzenegger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S Alemedia
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert R Sainz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn - Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hodges-Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rianda
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M - Bulanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. A. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R M Diaz
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F S Cotes
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Santa Cruz
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Duvall
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Zimmerman
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arline
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tilton
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Yates
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appelbaum
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bollard
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ward
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Adams
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. McCant
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nyguen
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wu
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhatt
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auguillera-Moreno
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Overly
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Sanchez
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Dahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Klarich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Deering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?