The Committee, et al v. City of Modesto, et al
Case Number: 1:2004cv06121
Filed: August 18, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Accommodations Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER Upon Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of the County of Stanislaus and Stanislaus County Sheriff, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/14/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER After Notice of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/5/2011. Filing Deadline: 12/29/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER Upon Stipulation Of Voluntary Dismissal Of The City Of Modesto, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/29/2011. (Fahrney, E)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER UPON STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Consolidated Regional Dispatch Agency and Law Enforcement Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/6/11. (Hellings, J)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER to Plaintiffs and Defendant SR911 TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2011. Show Cause Response due by 6/3/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE A FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 8, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for 2/28/2011 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 13, 2011. (Lira, I)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 3, 2011. (Lira, I)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 517 STIPULATION and ORDER -GRANTED. 511 514 MOTIONS to DISMISS currently set for 11/22/2010 has been CONTINUED to 12/15/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 3, 2010. (Lira, I)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/1/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 503 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2010 rescheduling the Settlement Conference from 11/1/2010 to 11/15/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT 497 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 27, 2010. Motion Hearing currenlty set for 9/1/2010 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER regarding current status of SR911, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/22/2010. (Amended Complaint due by 8/5/2010)(Martin, S)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 STIPULATION and ORDER re 493 Submitting Settlement Conference Statements (Deadline: 8/10/2010) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/22/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER After Status Conference; Reinstating Claims; Setting Briefing Schedule and a Settlement Conference; ORDER Directing Service on Lucian Thomas, Director of Stanislaus Regional 911, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/18/2010. Settlement Conference set for 8/24/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Committee, et al v. City of Modesto, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?