Brown v. Kyle, et al
Case Number: 1:2004cv06539
Filed: November 15, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER STRICKING 152 Motion to Withdraw his appeal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Denying 149 Motion for Transcripts at the Government's Expense, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/14/12. (Gonzalez, R)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DENYING 145 Motion for Designation and Transmission of Excerpts of the Record signed by Senior Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/6/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE and ORDER That Plaintiff is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/2012. (Jessen, A)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Requiring Production Of Plaintiff For Trial On Thursday, October 4, 2012, At 8:00 A.M., signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/2/2012. (Fahrney, E)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF ALFRED BROWN, CDCR #J-15695 for Trial set for 10/2/2012 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/5/2012. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Adopting 83 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and DISMISSING Defendant Ruff from Action Pursuant to Rule 4(M) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/2012. R - Ruff terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Resolving Objection and Denying Motion for Reconsideration 108 , 109 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/12/12. (Verduzco, M)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER (1) Granting 104 Request to Seal Response to Order to Show Cause; (2) Discharging Order to Show Cause 102 and Declining to Impose Sanctions, and (3) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 103 , 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/12. (Gonzalez, R)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions should not be Imposed Against them for Failure to Obey a Court Order; Ten-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, REFERRING Matter Back to Magistrate Judge to Set For Trial, and REQUIRING Parties to Meet and Confer Regarding Settlement 67 , 88 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/23/11: Sixty-Day Deadline for Defendants to File Status Report. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' reply, filed June 7, 2011, be DENIED; Defendants be GRANTED Judgment on Plaintiff's eye injury claim; Defendants Kyle and Domingo's Motion for Summary Judgment DENIED; Set for a Settlement Conference re 67 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by T Domingo, David Kyle ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/2/2011. Objections to F&R due by 9/6/2011 (Martin-Gill, S)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Ruff be DISMISSED from this action pursuant to Rule 4(m); re 81 Response to Order by the Court to Show Cause; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/07/2011. Objections to F&R due by 7/11/2011 (Martin-Gill, S)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant, Ruff should not be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/2011. Show Cause Response due by 4/25/2011.(Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER dismissing defendant, J Klarich from action signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/23/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Extending Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline from November 22, 2010 to March 8, 2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/18/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/8/2011.(Flores, E)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/18/2010 DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO EFFECT PERSONAL SERVICE on Defendant, Ruff and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to serve courtesy copy of order on Legal Affairs Division of CDCR. (Case Management Deadline: 12/20/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/10/2010 discharging 50 Order to Show Cause and requiring Plaintiff to make proper substitution for Defendant, Klarich and provide address for service. (Case Management Deadline: 9/12/2010).(Lundstrom, T)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendants Klarich and Ruff should not be Dismissed from this Action; Response from Plaintiff due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/18/2010. Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2010.(Sant Agata, S)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 32 Motion for Generalized Default signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/18/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion to Vacate and Reissue Scheduling Order; ORDER VACATING 38 Discovery/Scheduling Order of October 26, 2009; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue New Discovery/Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/10/2010. (Bradley, A)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 34 Motion to Amend Complaint, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/13/2009. (Bradley, A)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING First 26 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/23/2009. ( Completed Service Documents deadline: 5/26/2009) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Kyle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?