Merrill et al v. County of Madera, et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00195
Filed: February 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER DENYING 338 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and DISMISSING ACTION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/29/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER VACATING the hearing on the Motion to Amend Complaint, document 338 , set for hearing on 11/8/2010. The Court has deemed this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. As of 11/8/2010, the motion will be taken under submission; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/4/2010. (Rooney, M)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; Clerk of Court DIRECTED to Re-Open this Action; Plaintiffs are GRANTED Leave to File a Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add a Substantive Due Process Claim that Complies with the Ninth Circuit's July 22, 2010 Order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/24/2010. Case reopened. Any Motion to Amend, along with a copy of any Proposed Amended Complaint, shall be Filed by September 20, 2010. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill et al v. County of Madera, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?