Julian De Medeiros v. James A. Yates, et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv00397
Filed: March 25, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request For An Extension; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS For Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint 73 , 83 ; Objections Due September 19, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/24/11: Matter referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/2/11: Third Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty (30) Days. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Hellings, J)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER adopting 49 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 38 Motion for TRO. Action is referred to Magistrate Judge to review and screen the July 17, 2009 second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2010. (Vasquez, J)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider 56 and Motion to Stay 65 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/3/2010. (Verduzco, M)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 43 , 46 , 48 Motion Requesting Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/29/2010. (Martin, S)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/27/09: The March 6, 2009, recommendation of dismissal 33 is VACATED; This action proceeds on the April 14, 2009, Second Amended Complaint. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian De Medeiros v. James A. Yates, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?