Wilson v. Woodford et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv00700
Filed: June 2, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISMISSING Action Pursuant to FRCP 25(A)(1), and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/17/10. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to Supplement the Statement of Plaintiff's Death Upon the Record With Evidence of Proper Service Within Twenty Days 37 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/13/2009. Case Management Deadline: 12/7/2009. (Bradley, A)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Either Answer or Notice of Suggestion of Plaintiff's Death on the Record Within Thirty Days re 34 , 35 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/5/2009. Answer to Amended Complaint or Notice of Suggestion due by 12/8/2009. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?