Vlasich v. Fishback, et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01615
Filed: December 20, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/10/2011 recommending that 141 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Jesus Juarez and Simon Villa be GRANTED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/17/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Adopting 157 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING Defendant Fishback's 124 , 125 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/28/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER STRIKING 122 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel AS UNTIMELY; ORDER CLOSING DISCOVERY, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/31/2010. (Martin, S)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING 143 Motion for Court Order Directing Law Librarian to Make Copies; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File Only One Copy of Opposition without Proof of Service signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/25/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER REPLACING Defendants' 132 Motion for Summary Judgment of January 29, 2010 with Defendants' Renewed 141 Motion for Summary Judgment of April 30, 2010; ORDER for Plaintiff to File Opposition, or Statement of Non-Opposition, to the April 30, 2010 Motion within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/24/2010. Opposition or Non-opposition due by 6/28/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 116 Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Juarez and Villa, and for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/9/2009. (Sondheim, M)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 108 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Against Defendant Fishback signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/5/2009. (Bradley, A)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 82 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/29/2008. (Plaintiff's Opposition due 3/5/2009) (Figueroa, O)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Juarez and Villa's Second Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Request for Admissions 80 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/09. (Defendants Juarez and Villa's Response ddl EXTENDED to 1/16/2009)(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlasich v. Fishback, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?