Garcia v. Attorney General of California
Case Number: 1:2006cv00041
Filed: April 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Motion For Rehearing (Re: Dkt Entry 55 ), signed by District Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/23/2011. (Fahrney, E)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 54 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/2010. (Jessen, A)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT dated *09/29/2009* pursuant to order (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Attorney General of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?