Garland v. Skribner et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00270
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Referring Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice as duplicative. Referred to Judge Wanger, Objections to F&R due by 4/21/2006, signed by Judge William M. Wunderlich on 3/16/06. (Robles, S)
March 10, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:06cv00400 FCD DAD) to Fresno (1:06cv00270 OWW WMW) signed by Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/3/2006. (Matson, R)
March 3, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/3/2006 ORDERING: This action is transferred to the USDC in Fresno; and all future filings shall reference the new Fresno case number,Civ F-06-0198 OWW LJO PC.***Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garland v. Skribner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?