Caldwell v. Murphy
Case Number: 1:2006cv00601
Filed: May 17, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, with Prejudice, Pursuant to Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 02/12/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Report of pro se prisoner early settlement proceeding; case did not settle. Parties agreed to set out for thirty days for further settlement conference by phone. signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 10/20/09. (Masterson, G)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Gino Renard Caldwell to California State Prison-Solano on September 21, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING July 8, 2009 37 Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Gino Renard Caldwell, CDC#H-98246 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/17/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 **VACATED PER 41 ORDER** ORDER & WRIT Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Gino Renard Caldwell, CDC# H--98246, Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/2009. Gino Renard Caldwell, H-98246, is to be transported from R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility to California State Prison-Solano, 2100 Peabody Road, Vacaville, CA 95696-4000, for a Settlement Conference on August 18, 2009, at 11:00 a.m. (Scrivner, E)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2009 granting 30 Request to withdraw Motion for leave to amend; withdrawing 29 Motion to Amend the Complaint and directing Clerk to return 31 Lodged Amended Complaint to Plaintiff. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DISCOVERY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/2009; Discovery due 8/27/2009; Dispositive Motion due 10/27/2009. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?