Martinez v. Scribner
Case Number: 1:2006cv00656
Filed: May 30, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal and DIRECTING Clerk to Serve the Court of Appeals signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 7/24/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/16/2009. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION for EXTENSION filed by Felix Cruz Martinez, signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 02/03/2009. (Martin, S)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S 19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TOFILE OBJECTIONS TO 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 1/8/2009. (Objections to F&R due by 1/26/2009) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?