Johnson v. Sullivan et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01089
Filed: August 18, 2006
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to 240 Stipulation for Dismissal Signed by Both Parties After Settlement, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 10/27/2009. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File a Notice Verifying the Receipt of Settlement Funds on or Before September 28, 2009, and Further Directing Dispositive Documents In This Action be Filed on or Before October 23, 2009, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 9/17/2009. (Jessen, A)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER VACATING Trial Date and Telephonic Status Conference signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 8/6/2009. Defendants are to file updated reports on or before the last day of each month regarding the status of the disbursement of funds until the funds are disbursed. (Figueroa, O)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 {VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 235 } ORDER to Reschedule Telephonic Conference Call for 8/24/2009 at 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 7/27/2009. Defendants shall File with the Court, on or before 7/31/2009, a Short Written Statement Informing the Court of the Present Status of the Paperwork being Processed by the Attorney General's Office. (Sant Agata, S) .
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 5/1/2009. (Plaintiff's Response deadline: 5/18/2009)(Figueroa, O)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 {VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 221 } ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate GARRISON S. JOHNSON, CDCR # D-59672 for Settlement Conference on May 14, 2009 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 10, 6th Floor, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 04/29/2009. (Martin, S)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 {VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 235 } Revised SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/27/2009. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 6th Floor, before Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon.(Esteves, C) .
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING 203 Ex-Parte Request for a Telephonic Status Conference signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/23/2009. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/24/2009 at 09:30 AM via Free Conference before Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon.) (Figueroa, O)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/15/2009. ( Defendants' Mediation Filing deadline: 4/16/2009; Plaintiff's Mediation Filing Deadline: 4/17/2009; Defendant's Deadline: 4/21/2009) (Figueroa, O)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/9/2009. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2009 at 09:00 AM via Free Conference, a conference call agency, and the court and the parties will call 1-218-339-2699 and then enter pin number 512956. (Sondheim, M)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/7/2009. ( Secretary Cate's Response Deadline: 4/14/2009) (Figueroa, O)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 4/3/09 Jury Trial RE-SET for 7/13/2009 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon and a telephonic status conference is SET for 4/14/2009 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon. (Carlos, K)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 1/21/2009, DENYING Defendants' 163 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION; DENYING Plaintiff's 164 MOTION for SANCTIONS; DENYING Plaintiff's 178 179 MOTION to COMPEL; DIRECTING Counsel for Plaintiff to Supplement their 160 161 Ex Parte Applications for Advance Authorization to Cover Costs. (Jessen, A)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DIRECTING Counsel for Plaintiff to File a Supplemental Brief, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 1/16/2009. Response due by 1/23/2009. (Jessen, A)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 171 MOTION for EXTENSION of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 1/14/2009. ( Filing due by 1/20/2009) (Figueroa, O)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Directing Defendant Gonzales to Arrange for Plaintiff to Speak to his Counsel by Telephone ON OR BEFORE TUESDAY, JANUARY 13, 2009, at 5:00 p.m., so that counsel can prepare their client for his upcoming deposition, signed by Senior Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 1/9/2009. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO 29 , signed by Senior Circuit Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 2/6/08. ( Filing ddl EXTENDED to 2/28/2008.) (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?