Fraher v. Surydevara
Case Number: 1:2006cv01120
Filed: August 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement Be GRANTED 143 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT is referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to Findings and Recommendations due by 3/15/2011 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/2/2011. (Yu, L)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Amended Request for Authority to Incur Costs (Appointed Counsel) and Request for Payment and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/02/2010. (Martin, S)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER continuing hearing on motion for summary judgment to November 8, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/27/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/23/2010. ORDERING pltf's attorney's request for authority to incur costs and request for payment regarding copies of pltf's medical records is GRANTED.(Crouch, J)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING 132 Defendant Mohammad Ashrafs Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER VACATING the hearing on Defendant Mohammad Ashrafs Motion for Summary Judgment set for August 23, 2010, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/9/2010. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Estate of Nancy Spaeder, R.N., in Light of Stipulation of Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/2/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Discharging 136 Order to Show Cause in Light of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/2/2010. (Esteves, C)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER to extend the expert discovery deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/29/2010. (Expert discovery ddl 10/8/2010)(Kusamura, W)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Summons and Third Amended Complaint have not been served in Complainance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/2010. (Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2010.)(Kusamura, W)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ADOPTING 128 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 107 Motion to Substitute without Prejudice as Moot signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/04/2010. (Flores, E)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending DENIAL of 107 MOTION, Without Prejudice, as MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/11/2010. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/1/2010. (Sondheim, M)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER on Findings and Recommendations 68 , 86 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/09: The Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED consistent with this order; Defendant Dr. Ashraf's motion to strike is GRANTED and punitive damages against Defendant Dr. Ashraf in the Second Amended Complaint is STRICKEN without prejudice; and Plaintiff may file a Motion to Amend with the Magistrate Judge within thirty (30) days of service of this order.(Hellings, J)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing Date and Extending Time For Filing of Supplemental Briefs Addressing Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction 109 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/2009. Supplemental Brief due 8/3/2009; Supplemental Brief in Support of Opposition due 8/19/2009; Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED from 8/17/2009 TO 8/31/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Esteves, C)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Redesignate Case as a Regular Civil Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/9/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2009. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraher v. Surydevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?