Brewer v. Salyer
Case Number: 1:2006cv01324
Filed: September 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Dismissal of Class Claims, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/29/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CLASS CLAIMS 225 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2017. (Thorp, J)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Reschedule the Status Conference, document 188 . The Status Conference currently set for 10/17/2012 is CONTINUED and will now be heard on 1/30/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck; order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/9/2012. (Rooney, M)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 182 Motion to Lift the Discovery Stay ; ORDER setting status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/29/2012. (Status Reports Deadline: 9/21/2012; Status Conference set for 9/26/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING 165 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel without prejudice; Order GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/16/2010. (Hernandez, M)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING THE TRUSTEE'S PRODUCTION OF EMPLOYEE LIST. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/1/2010. (Hernandez, M)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REGARDING 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Non-Party Trustee to Comply with Subpoena. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, the Court sets a further telephonic conference for 3/1/2010 at 12:00pm. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/22/2010. (Hernandez, M)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying 132 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel without prejudice; Granting 134 Motion to Stay discovery in part. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/8/2010. (Timken, A)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 144 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply - Plaintiffs shall file their sur-reply addressing only the 12/24/2009, order, no later than 1/5/2010 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/4/2010. (Hernandez, M)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion to Modify the Class Definition signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/7/2009. Second Amended Complaint Due by 7/27/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?