Quiroz v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01426
Filed: October 16, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to CLOSE Action Pursuant to Parties' 102 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/16/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER VACATING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing Pursuant to Notice of Settlement, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/30/2012. Telephonic trial confirmation hearing set for February 1, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. before Chief United States District Judge Anthony W. Ishii is VACATED; Trial date REMAINS March 6, 2012. (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/27/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 97 Motion for Leave to take Trial Deposition of Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/26/2012. (Flores, E)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REQUIRING Witnesses to Return Money Orders to Plaintiff's Counsel; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/12/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER VACATING Subpoenas For Roger Low and Rejenda Dwivide, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/3/2011. (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/3/2011 regarding 68 , 70 Motions. (Lundstrom, T)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Date from January 24, 2012 to March 6, 2012 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/1/2011. (Jury Trial set for 3/6/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Figueroa, O)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Appointing Counsel, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/29/11. Attorney Jonathan Acker Shapiro for Carlos Quiroz added. (Verduzco, M)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Requesting Confidential Statements re: Case Selection for Prisoner Settlement Program, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/9/11. (Verduzco, M)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Directing Service Of Subpoena On Witness Roger Low By The United States Marshal Without Prepayment Of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/13/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Transport Of Other Prisoners (Doc. 60 ), ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion For Continuance And Modification Of Scheduling Order (Doc. 62 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/16/10: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER disregarding 52 Motion for Settlement Conference; granting 54 Motion for Extension of time to submit Money Orders and denying 55 Motion for appointment of Medical Expert signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/10/2010. (Filing Deadline: 1/18/2011). (Lundstrom, T)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Providing Travel Expense for Plaintiff's Proposed Unincarcerated Witnesses; Response Due within 20 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/26/2010. Response due by 11/19/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/07/2010. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Flores, E)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations in Part 35 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Strike Defendants' Amended Declarations 36 , 39 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/16/2010. (Verduzco, M)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/10: Recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Be Granted In Part and Denied In Part; 1 Complaint filed by Carlos Quiroz, 26 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by P. McGuinness, M.D., D. Adams, Shen, S.P. Wu, Aytigalla referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 9/8/2010. (Hellings, J)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Defendant LEAVE to submit Amended Delcarations in support of 26 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/19/2010. (Amended Declarations due by 8/6/2010.)(Marrujo, C)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING in FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 24 and DISMISSING Defendant Kazi From Action, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/13/09: Defendant Kazi is DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m).(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroz v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?