Williams v. Garza et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv01569
Filed: November 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute re 1 Complaint filed by Lumpkin Williams; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/07/2011. Objections to F&R due by 2/14/2011 (Martin, S)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2010. Defendants Trimble, Fresno County Sheriff Investigation Division and Myers terminated. (Bradley, A)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants Should Not be Dismissed From This Action; Response Due Within 30 Days; ORDER to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Response Due Within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/21/2010. Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 10/25/2010. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2010. (Bradley, A)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ***VACATED PER 34 ORDER*** FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this 19 Action be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/16/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/22/2010. (Flores, E)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/1/2010. (Figueroa, O)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 {VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 29 } FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this 19 Action be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/24/2009. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/28/2009. (Sant Agata, S) .
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***VACATED PER ORDER NO. 20 *** FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey a Court Order; Objections, if any, Due in 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/9/2009. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 8/11/2009. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Garza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?