July 22, 2016 |
Filing
174
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 167 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice; ORDER GRANTING 168 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Time to File Appeal; and ORDER for Clerk to Send Copies to Plaintiff signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/21/2016. Appeal due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing
157
ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment from Court's Calendar, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/21/15. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
154
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 136 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED re 16 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/1/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
148
ORDER REQUESTING Clarification from Defense Counsel within Fifteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing
146
ORDER GRANTING 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER VACATING 144 Order of November 25, 2014; ORDER DENYING 139 Defendants' Request to File Documents Under Seal; and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Sixty (60) Days in Which to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/12/2015. Opposition due within sixty (60) days. (Jessen, A)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing
144
ORDER Granting Defendants' 139 Request to File Documents under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/24/2014. (Flores, E)
|
October 24, 2014 |
Filing
140
ORDER DENYING 135 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/24/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
134
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 133 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motion; Deadline: October 22, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/20/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
132
ORDER RESOLVED 131 Rule 36 (a)(6) Motion; ORDER Finding Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Request for Admissions to be Sufficient, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/6/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
128
ORDER GRANTING 127 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification of Deadline; ORDER Extending Deadlines Established in Court's Order of March 11, 2014; and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff' Thirty Day Deadline to Serve New Requests for Admissions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2014. Discovery due by 8/15/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/15/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing
126
ORDER DENYING 125 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Order and DENYING Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin From Participation in This Case signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/22/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
March 11, 2014 |
Filing
123
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 108 , 109 , 110 , 113 ; 120 ; ORDER Reopening Discovery for Limited Purpose; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to Serve Each Defendant up to Twenty-Five Requests for Admissions as Instructed by this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/10/14. 30-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to Serve Requests for Admissions; New Deadline to Complete Discovery: 6/30/2014; New Deadline to File Dispositive Motions: 8/29/2014. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
122
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 118 Without Imposing Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/7/14. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
118
ORDER For Defendants To SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed For Failure To Fully Comply With Court Order (Doc. 115 ), Thirty Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2014. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
115
ORDER Closing Discovery; ORDER for Defendants to File Oppositions or Notices of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Four Motions to Compel, by January 24, 2014; ORDER Extending Deadline to File Pretrial Dispositive Motions, for All Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/6/13. Pretrial Dispositive Motions Deadline: 4/30/2014. (Verduzco, M)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
104
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 101 Motion to Compel; ORDER Requiring Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/02/2013. Discovery due by 9/9/2013.(Flores, E)
|
June 11, 2013 |
Filing
102
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS GARCIA AND GUERRERO re 96 , 99 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/11/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants Guerrero and Garcia Not Be Dismissed From This Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute Against Them THIRTY DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/12. (Hellings, J)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing
88
ORDER ADOPTING 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Exhaust, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/9/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 18, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 66 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/18/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
84
ORDER Granting Motion for Reconsideration 83 ; ORDER Granting Final Extension of Time to File Supplemental Objections, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/2/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 74 Motion for leave to file supplemental objections signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2011. (Filing Deadline: 7/19/2011). (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
75
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/2011 recommending that 66 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Eric C.R. K'napp be DENIED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/27/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
68
ORDER Requiring Defendants to File Reply to Plaintiff's 67 Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/7/2011. (Reply due by 3/31/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Stay; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Objections; Sixty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2010. Objections to F&R due by 1/21/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER Vacating Motion To Dismiss From Court's Calendar (Doc. 40 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/20/2010. (Scrivner, E)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
51
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 40 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted in Part and Denied in Part re 16 Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/22/2010. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 9/27/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Re Defendants' Failure to Respond to the Court's Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/01/2010. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2010. (Flores, E)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; DISMISSING Certain Claims and Certain Defendants; DISMISSING Defendants Foulks; Cate and Domen, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/14/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing
20
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENIAL of 14 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/16/2009. Motion referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 2/18/2009)(Figueroa, O)
|
December 11, 2006 |
Filing
7
FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/8/2006. (Arellano, S.)
|