Carpenter v. Sullivan, et al.
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Carpenter
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan, M. S. Evans, M. Carrasco and A. Pfeil
Case Number: 1:2007cv00114
Filed: January 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 334 Motion to Rescind Filing Fee Overpayment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's 332 Motion for Clarification Regarding Payment of Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/7/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Join (ECF No. 315 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER Denying As Moot Defendant's Oral Motions Pursuant To Rule 50 And 12(B)(1) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER and RECEIPT for Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/14. (Lundstrom, T)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/25/2014 that inmate Antoine Williams is no longer need as witness in these proceedings and 258 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum is discharged.(Lundstrom, T)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 JUDGMENT dated *3/19/2014* in Favor of Defendants J. Gonzalez, J. Barajas, Ortiz, and Litton and Against Plaintiff Willie Lee Carpenter. (Jessen, A)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION of Inmate Witness Brian DeCoud for Trial on March 25, 2014, at 8:00 A.M. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2014. (Jessen, A)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 SECOND AMENDMENT to Pretrial ORDER dated February 20, 2014 as to 234 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/06/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDMENT to PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER VACATING WRITS OF TRANSPORTATION for March 18, 2014 as to 248 First Amended Writ for Sean Richson, 237 Writ for Mark Lewis, 241 Writ for Antoine Williams, 240 Writ for Troy Watts; ORDERED that Court will re-issue Amended Writs of Transportation for Richson, Lewis and Williams to appear on March 25, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/03/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Sean Richson for Trial on March 18, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/26/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 242 Motion for Leave to Seek Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to TransportAntoine Williams, T-29591, for Trial on March 18, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Denying Motion Plaintiff's Request For Address And Location Of Expert Witnessess (ECF No. 222 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 214 Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2014. Within ten (10) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall inform the Court of the five witnesses he intends to call regarding the January 20, 2005, incident. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING 212 Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance of Unincarcerated Witness and DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2014. Money order in the amount of $217.19 for witness Lieutenant R. L. Johnson due by 1/27/2014. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Imposition Of Sanctions Against Defendants (ECF No. 199 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2014. (Fahrney, E)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/13. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 2/19/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing set for 3/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Jury Trial set for 3/18/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/13. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Assigning Action to Magistrate Judge; New Case Number: 1:07-cv-114 SAB (PC), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/16/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER denying 196 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 191 , Recommending Denying Defendants' 147 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/13. (Verduzco, M)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Clerical Error 193 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/26/13. (Hellings, J)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 147 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED re 17 Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/17/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Permitting Plaintiff Opportunity to Withdraw Opposition and File Amended Opposition in Light of Separately-Issued Summary Judgment Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/3/2012. (Twenty-One Day Deadline.) (Marrujo, C)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Denying As Moot Plaintiff's Motion To Accept Mail That Was Delayed Judgment (Doc. 176 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/19/2012. (Fahrney, E)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Notice of Erratum (Doc. 168 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 1/17/2012. (Fahrney, E)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena re 167 Opposition to Motion filed by A. Salazar, Ortiz, A. Pfeil, Litton, J. Barajas, J. Martinez, J. Gonzalez, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/20/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying 120 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/4/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 140 Motion for sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/3/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 104 Motion for assistance facilitating communication with inmate witnessess signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/31/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/27/2011. (Discovery due by 1/5/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 2/6/2012.) (Marrujo, C)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING 97 Motion Ordering Answer and For Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/26/2011. (Marrujo, C)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (# 146 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/13/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 134 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/11/11. (Lundstrom, T)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER SETTING Case For a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/21/11: Settlement Conference set for 8/12/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston at California State Prison, Los Angeles County, 44750 60th Street, West Lancaster, California 93536; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on the Litigation Office at California State Prison, Los Angeles County via facsimile at (661) 729-6994. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER STAYING Case Until Resolution of Pending Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 6/21/11: Both parties are warned that the Court will strike any subsequent motions unrelated to settlement if such motions are filed before the stay is lifted. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Referring Case to the Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) Program signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/6/2011. Plaintiffs 122 motion for a settlement conference is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the ADR Program Director, Sujean Park. (Marrujo, C)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion To Extend Deadlines For Discovery And Dispositive Motions (Doc. 96 ), ORDER Denying As Moot Plaintiff's Motion To Extend Discovery (Doc. 99 ), ORDER Extending Application Of Discovery And Scheduling Order To Defendant Martinez, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/2/2011. (Unenumerated Deadline: 6/2/2011, Discovery due by 7/15/2011, Dispositive Motions filed by 10/12/2011) (Fahrney, E)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, ORDER Dismissing Certain Defendants (Docs. 74 , 95 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/28/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/30/2010 recommending that 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be GRANTED and recommending DISMISSAL of certain Defendants. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/7/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Depose Plaintiff By Video Conference (Doc. 87 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/14/2010. (Fahrney, E)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/19/2010 extending application of 68 Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Litton and Salazar and amending order to extend Rule 12(b) Motion deadline to 8/31/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 70 , 71 Motions for Orders Directing Defendants to Reply to the Complaint AS MOOT; ORDER EXTENDING Application of Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Sullivan, Evans, Carrasco, Pfeil, Gonzalez, Barajas, and Ortiz re 68 , 72 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/26/2010.(Bradley, A)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER CLARIFYING Cognizable Claims and GRANTING Plaintiff's 63 , 64 Motions to Correct Error/Mistake re 59 , 60 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/11/2010. (Bradley, A)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS to Respond to 17 First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/12/2010. Defendants A. Pfeil, J. Gonzales, J. Barajas and M. Ortiz shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by 5/13/2010. (Jessen, A)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/16/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING 52 Findings and Recommendations signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/2009. (Figueroa, O)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief be DENIED AS MOOT. re 17 Amended Complaint filed by Willie Lee Carpenter; 19 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Willie Lee Carpenter ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 08/12/2009. Objections to F&R due by 9/15/2009 (Martin, S)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/7/09: This action proceeds on the September 17, 2008, First Amended Complaint 17 .(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Sullivan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. S. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pfeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?