Palmer v. Crotty, et al.
Plaintiff: Steven M. Palmer
Defendant: Crotty, Chief Medical Officer of California Correctional Institute and Salinas Valley Prison
Case Number: 1:2007cv00148
Filed: January 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Defendant's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/20/2010. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/13/2011. (Verduzco, M)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and ORDER DENYING Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/21/2010. (Jessen, A)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant Crotty's 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be GRANTED, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2009. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/17/2009. (Sondheim, M)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 39 Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/8/2009. Defendant Crotty has not yet filed an answer to the amended complaint. The parties are advised that the deadlines set forth in the Discovery and Scheduling Order filed September 4, 2009 apply only to defendant Tate. (Figueroa, O)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 32 Motion for appointment of an attorney investigator signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/4/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Respond to 34 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Crotty; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to send to Plaintiff copy of Second Informational Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 09/02/2009.(Response to Motion to Dismiss due by: 9/28/2009) (copy of 01/14/2009 Second Informational Order forwarded to Plaintiff per this order) (Martin, S)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second Request for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/23/09: Responsive Pleading ddl EXTENDED to 5/27/2009. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Crotty, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Medical Officer of California Correctional Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?