McCoy v. Spidle et al
Plaintiff: Davon E. McCoy
Defendant: - Buckley, R Spidle, R Perry, Doyle, Dreith, M Dangler, L Watson, P Stockman, I. Garza, Allen, Samaya and - Tomlin
Case Number: 1:2007cv00198
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/30/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER Vacating Order 302 and Dismissing With Prejudice Defendants Reynoso, Morales, Poblete, Campos, Gonzales, and Reyes Only Pursuant to Stipulation 301 , signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/25/12. Morales, Poblete, Renoso, C. Reyes, Compos and Gonzales terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE/ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 06/21/2012. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/25/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Lisa Jimenez is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SETTLEMENT ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/23/12. (Gonzalez, R)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/16/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Lisa Jimenez is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 4/12/12. Settlement Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 01:00 PM at Salinas Valley State Prison before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Verduzco, M)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel regarding mileage signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/8/2012. (Crouch, J)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER re: Video Conference Testimony of Samuel Dancy, CDCR #J-07642, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/27/12. (Verduzco, M)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/17/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs regarding expert witness fees is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 EX PARTE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/13/2012. Telephonic CJA Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel set for 1/17/2012 at 11:30 AM (Arizona Time) before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness Lennell T. Brooks for Trial on 1/30/2012 at 9:00 a.m. signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/11/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Davon E. McCoy, CDCR #H-67575 for Trial on 1/30/2012 at 9:00am, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/21/11. (Verduzco, M)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/30/2011. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/17/2012 at 03:00 PM Arizona time before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee.) (Marrujo, C)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Davon E. McCoy, CDCR #H-67575 for Trial on 1/31/2012 at 9:00am, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/22/11. (Verduzco, M)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/16/2011 ORDERING pltf's attorney's request for authority to incur costs regarding travel to the deposition of David G. Smith, M.D. is GRANTED.(Crouch, J)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 204 Motion to Extend Expert Witness Discovery Cut-Off; ORDER that the Original Expert Discovery Deadline set in the Court's Pretrial Order is VACATED; ORDER that the last Day for Expert Discovery is Friday, July 22, 2011 signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/3/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER SETTING Matter for Trial, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/27/2011. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2012 through 2/10/2012. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Denying Defendants' 212 Motion in Limine; ORDER Setting a Status Conference, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 4/18/11. Telephonic Status Conference Hearing set for 5/3/2011 at 01:30 PM Arizona Time, before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Gonzalez, R)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Davon E. McCoy for Trial on May 9-13, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 26 of this Court located at 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/25/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/9/2011. Defendants are to file a Motion in Limine by Friday, March 25, 2011. Plaintiff is to file a Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine by Friday, April 8, 2011. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/8/2011 ORDERING pltf's attorney's request for authority to incur costs regarding mileage expenses is GRANTED.(Crouch, J)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING in Part Defendants' 200 Motion to Sever Claims and Bifurcate Damages; ORDER for Telephonic Status Hearing for 3/8/2011 at 01:30 PM (Arizona Time) before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/23/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/23/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/11/2011 at 03:00 PM before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Sant Agata, S)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER on Request of Pro Bono for Pre-Approval of Expenditures, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 11/17/10: Expenditure is APPROVED. (Hellings, J)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING 193 Amended Stipulation; Disclose Experts on 11/15/2010 and conduct Expert Discovery from 12/01/2010 through 01/31/2011, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 10/21/2010. (Martin, S)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING 191 ; ORDERED that parties shall Disclose Experts on October 15, 2010 and Conduct Expert Discovery from November 1, 2010 through December 3, 2010, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 10/16/2010. (Martin, S)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 9/9/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6B, Sixth Floor, Evo A. DeConcini United States Courthouse, 405 W. Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona before District Judge David C. Bury.(Verduzco, M)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Appointing Counsel for Plaintiff; Attorney Lisa Blanco Jimenez for Davon E. McCoy added, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 05/13/2010. (Copy of this order served on Lisa Jimenez, Neumiller & Beardslee via USPS)(Martin, S)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION and ORDER for Voluntary DISMISSAL of Defendant ***D.Reyes***STIPULATION AND ORDER Substituting ***C. Reyes*** as Defendant, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 02/08/2010. (Response to Plaintiff Deadline: 3/4/2010 and Answer Deadline: 3/29/2010) (Martin, S)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 1/11/2010. IT IS ORDERED That the 165 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED; the 166 Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED AS MOOT ; the 164 Motion Requesting Leave of Court Shall be Treated as a Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order and docketed accordingly; the 155 Motion for Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED; and That Plaintiff Shall be Appointed Counsel. (Bradley, A)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER that the Second Request For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs October 23, 2009 Motion 157 is GRANTED until December 4, 2009; ORDER that the Motion for Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order 155 is DENIED IN PART as to Plaintiffs allegations related to new rule violations and grievances. Defendants shall file a Response to the remaining charges of retaliation by December 4, 2009 signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 10/03/2009. (Flores, E)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 11/16/2009. IT IS ORDERED That Plaintiff's 152 Statement is STRICKEN From the Record, and the Clerk of the Court Shall Send it to Sujean Younger at 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, California 95814. (Bradley, A)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 147 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Information With the Court and DIRECTING Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's Document Filed October 23, 2009, Within 10 Days, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 10/28/2009. Defendant's Response due by 11/9/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 10/22/2009. Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2009 at 09:00 AM at California State Prison Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DENYING 99 Motion for Summary Judgment, Except In the Part Granted by the Court on May 6, 2009; ORDER DENYING 125 134 135 136 140 All Other Pending Motions; ORDER That the Court Will Rule on Defendants' Request That This Court Reaffirm Its Grant of Summary Judgment Pending Supplemental Briefing; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Within 20 Days of the Filing Date of This Order; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Refer Case to a Settlement Con ference; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Provide a Status Report Regarding Settlement Conference, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 9/30/2009. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply due by 10/21/2009. (cc: Sue Jane Younger via e-mail). (Jessen, A)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 2/6/2009. The Court HEREBY ORDERS: (1) Defendant McNamara is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice; (2) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 87 is DENIED;(3) Defendants' Motion for Extension 97 is GRANTED;(4) The Deadline to for Filing Dispositive Motions is Extended to 2/20/2009;(5) In the Event this Case is not Resolved on a Dispositive Motion, the Court Shall Set Appropriate Case Management Deadlines for the Case to Proceed to Trial. (Arellano, S.)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for the Lack of Service on Defendant McNamara and an Appropriate Period of Time to Extend Completion of Service, signed by District Judge David C. Bury on 1/8/2009. If Good Cause is not shown, the Court may Dismiss Defendant McNamara from this Action. Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2009. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 54 Request For Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/2008. (Reply Brief due by 2/23/2008.)(Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Spidle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Spidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Dangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Stockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon E. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?