Andrews Farms et al v. Calcot Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Andrews Farms and Greg Palla
Defendant: Calcot Ltd, Eadie & Payne, LLP and Robert W. Norris
Case Number: 1:2007cv00464
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2011 349 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/6/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 18, 2011 344 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/18/2011. (Filing Deadline: 9/20/2011. In Court Hearing set for 10/4/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill). (Lundstrom, T)
July 7, 2011 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 6, 2011. (Lira, I)
May 20, 2011 327 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File the motion for approval of settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/2011. Filing Deadline: 6/6/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 4, 2011 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Second Stipulation for Extension of Time To File Notice of Settlementsigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/2011. Stipulated notice of settlement filed no later than 5/12/2011. Motion for approval of settlement filed no later than 5/23/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 20, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Extension to File Notice of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/20/2011. Filing Deadline: 5/3/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 28, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2011. The Status Conference is RESET for 3/28/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 10, 2010 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Continuing Status Conference (Doc. 306 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/10/2010. The Status Conference Re: Class Notice now set for November 15, 2010 is CONTINUED to December 6, 2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (U.S. District Court, Fresno Division) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Arellano, S.)
October 13, 2010 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL 294 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 13, 2010. (Lira, I)
August 23, 2010 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DECERTIFY CLASS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 23, 2010. (Lira, I)
July 23, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2010 re 275 Stipulation of Dismissal; Plaintiff, Greg Palla dismissed from action. (Lundstrom, T)
July 16, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 16, 2010. (Lira, I)
June 8, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for 221 Motion for Protective Order re use and dissemination of confidential information signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/8/2010. (Timken, A)
May 28, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING the scheduling conference currently on calendar for 6/3/2010 and CONTINUING it to 7/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/28/2010. (Rooney, M)
May 5, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 5, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for 5/24/2010 has been CONTINUED to 6/8/2010 at 8:30am. (Lira, I)
April 27, 2010 243 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Motion to Amend Class Certification: Reply due by 5/4/2010, Response due by 5/17/2010, Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/27/2010. (Kusamura, W)
April 22, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the hearing date on the motion for protective order. The Motion for Protective Order currently set for 4/30/2010 before Magistrate Judge Beck has been continued to 6/11/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2010. (Timken, A)
April 5, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the Hearing re Motion for Protective Order currently set for 4/16/2010 to 4/30/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/3/2010. (Timken, A)
February 16, 2010 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION 170 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 16, 2010. (Lira, I)
January 28, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS' REPLY DEADLINE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 27, 2010. (Lira, I)
December 3, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendants' Application for Continuance of Hearing dates on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, Opposition filing ddl 1/14/2010, Reply ddl 1/21/2010 and the Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/3/009. (Kusamura, W)
September 25, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING date to file mandatory joint scheduling conference report from 9/23/2009 to 9/25/2009 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/24/2009. (Hernandez, M)
September 10, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 9/30/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/8/2009. (Hernandez, M)
August 20, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference For Class Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 08/20/09. 159 ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2009 at 09:30AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 5, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 5, 2009. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/12/09 has been VACATED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Lira, I)
May 1, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion (Doc. 73 , 98 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/30/2009. (Plaintiff's Reply due by: 6/11/2009, Defendant's Opposition due by: 6/4/2009, Plaintiff's Renewed Motion due by 5/21/2009, Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill)(Scrivner, E)
March 30, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/30/2007. (Hernandez, M)
March 23, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending page limit for defendant Calcot, Ltds motion to dismiss to 35 pages signed by Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/23/3007. (Lucas, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews Farms et al v. Calcot Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calcot Ltd
Represented By: Michael Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eadie & Payne, LLP
Represented By: Marshall C. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Norris
Represented By: Michael Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrews Farms
Represented By: Ralph B. Wegis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Palla
Represented By: Ralph B. Wegis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?