Sokolsky v. Voss et al
Plaintiff: Mark S. Sokolsky
Defendant: W. T. Voss and Peter Bresler
Case Number: 1:2007cv00613
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that action be dismissed for failure to prosecute re 13 Amended Complaint filed by Mark S. Sokolsky. Findings and Recommendations submitted to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/12/2010. (Vasquez, J)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/10/2010 requiring Plaintiff to file a response to 28 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Response due by 10/13/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 26 Motion for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/10/2010. (Bradley, A)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 21 Request to Correct Second Informational Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/05/2009. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Circuit Judge Arthur L. Alarcon on 2/7/2008. Plaintiff's April 23, 2007 original complaint is DISMISSED; Plaintiff's May 8, 2007 first amended complaint is DISMISSED; Plaintiff is GRANTED 35 days to file a second amended complaint; Plaintiff's October 15, 2007 motion for order is DENIED as moot. {VACATED per order 12 .} (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sokolsky v. Voss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. T. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bresler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Sokolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?