Landau v. Voss et al

Plaintiff: Sid Landau
Defendant: W. T. Voss, Erica Weinstein, Peter Bresler, Roberto Morisho, Mohinder Kaur, Wendy Allen, September Winchel, James Forrest and Leo Adcock
Case Number: 1:2007cv00815
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Stipulation for Dismissal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/15. CASE CLOSED.(Marrujo, C)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/08/2014. Attorney Philip C. Bourdette for Sid Landau added. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RULINGS on Motions in Limine, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/2/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 132 Motion for Assistance from Patient Advocates as Moot, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/25/14. (Gonzalez, R)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER VACATING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Witness Jerome A. Rogers, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/14/14. (Hellings, J)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Order setting telphonic conference, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/11/2014. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 3/18/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Figueroa, O)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/14. (Nazaroff, H)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jerome A. Rogers, Booking# 1304300270, Witness, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/6/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Notify the Court Whether they will Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within Five Days; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Send Consent Forms to the Parties signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/05/2014. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Sid Landau, CO-000251-9, Plaintiff, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/3/14. (Marrujo, C)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 154 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/26/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Prohibiting Anyone but Plaintiff to Participate in Jerome Rogers' Deposition on February 24, 2014 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/20/2014. (Flores, E)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2014 continuing Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing to 2/10/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Lundstrom, T)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Regarding Pretrial Statements, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER of Referral for Settlement Week and Setting Settlement Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/19/2013. ( Settlement Conference ( Video Conference) set for 6/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney in Sacramento, CA) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Regarding Possible Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/11/2013. (Flores, E)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 126 Request for Continuance of January 14, 2013, Status Conference to March 18, 2013, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/2012. Status Conference set for 3/18/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Flores, E)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether they Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within Thirty Days; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Send Consent Forms to Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/01/2012. Pretrial Statement due by 8/14/2012; Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 9/4/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 10/16/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Flores, E)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Vacating May 7, 2012, Telephonic Hearing; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/27/12. Response due within fourteen days.(Verduzco, M)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Defendants Roberto Morisho and W.T. Voss From Action 107 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/10/12. (Hellings, J)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING 106 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING Defendant Allen's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/6/2012. Defendant Allen is dismissed from this action. (Marrujo, C)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Withdrawing Orders (Doc. 71 , 74 ), FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal Of Defendants Roberto Morisho And W.T. Voss From Action (Docs. 70 , 73 ), Objections, If Any, Due Within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/13/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/30/2011. (Fahrney, E)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Defendant Allen's 96 Motion for Sumamry Judgment be Granted signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/08/2011. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/5/2011. (Flores, E)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISCHARGING 92 Order to Show Cause and ORDER VACATING 78 Second Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/21/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER VACATING January 24, 2011 Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing and Referring Matter to Magistrate Judge, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/19/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Parties Should Not Be Sanctioned for Failure to Obey a Court Order re 78 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/18/2011. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2011. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Allen's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/13/10: Defendant Allen is granted twenty (20) days from the date of service of this order in which to file her answer to Plaintiff's complaint. (Hellings, J)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Enter Default Against Defendant Wendy Allen; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/01/2010. (Flores, E)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Wendy Allen should not be Dismissed from this Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/8/2010. Show Cause Response due by 10/12/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part 48 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT: GRANTING in favor of Defendants Weinstein, Bresler, and Kaur for the failure to protect claim, and in favor of Def endants Winchell, Kaur, Adcock, and Forrest for the retaliation claim AND DENYING Defendants' Motion for Excessive Force claim against Defendants Adcock and Forrest; REFERRING Action to Magistrate Judge for further Scheduling and Proceedings signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/1/2010. (Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Adopting 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion for Excessive Force against Defendants Adcock and Forrest; ORDER REFERRING Action to Magistrate Judge for further Scheduling and Proceedings signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/24/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Roberto Morisho, Without Prejudice, from Action signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/24/2010. Roberto Morisho terminated.(Sant Agata, S)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part and Denied in Part; Objections Due within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/13/2010. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 8/16/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/6/2010 dismissing Defendant, W. T. Voss from action. (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying 61 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Testimony, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/29/2010. (Verduzco, M)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Based Solely on California State Law signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2009. (Bradley, A)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 **DISCHARGED Pursuant to 59 Order** ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Within Thirty Days why Defendant Roberto Morisho Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service 41 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/13/2009. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2009. (Bradley, A)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 46 Motion for re-service signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 08/02/2009. (Flores, E)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Dismissal of Doe Defendants I thru 10 for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service of Process signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/23/2009. Motion referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2009. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 **VACATED Pursuant to 59 Order** FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Dismissal of Defendant Voss from Action signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/13/2009. Motion referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2009. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/17/2009. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2009. (Esteves, C)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to submit application to proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $350.00 Filing Fee, signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/07/2007. Filing due by 7/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Instructions# 2 IFP Application)(Martin, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landau v. Voss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sid Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. T. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bresler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Morisho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohinder Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: September Winchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?