de Leon Buera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edna de Leon Buera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2007cv01051
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Regarding 50 Motion for Attorneys' Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/20/2012. (Bradley, A)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER for the Award of Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) re 47 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/16/2011. (Bradley, A)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/26/2011 REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time to submit Plaintiff's confidential brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/17/2010. (Plaintiff's Confidential Brief Deadline: 1/14/2011) (Figueroa, O)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 INFORMATIONAL ORDER For Pro Se Litigants and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/13/2010. (Esteves, C)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO REOPEN ACTION AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A STATUS REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/3/2010 (Filing Deadline: 10/7/2010), Case reopened.(Hutcheson, C)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER For Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/30/2010. Status Report due within five days. (Esteves, C)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER For Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/10/2010. (Esteves, C)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER For Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/14/2009. Status Report due within 5 days. (Esteves, C)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER For Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/28/2009. Status Report due by 3/3/2009. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Leon Buera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna de Leon Buera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin E. Hall, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?