Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Charles Samuel Brown, Sr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2007cv01375
Filed: September 19, 2007
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the Court Grant Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) [Doc. 29]. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/23/2010, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/19/2010. (Herman, H)
July 1, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time: Defendant's time to file a response to Plaintiff's Petition for Fees in this case is extended 14 days from June 25, 2010 to July 9, 2010. Plaintiff's time to file a reply is extended to July 19, 2010. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/2010. (Herman, H)
July 9, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d); ORDER, signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/8/2009. (Herman, H)
May 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint 20 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/09. CASE CLOSED(Gil-Garcia, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Samuel Brown, Sr
Represented By: Robert Ishikawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?