Dowd v. Yates

Plaintiff: Rodney Lamont Dowd
Defendant: James A. Yates
Case Number: 1:2007cv01505
Filed: October 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING 84 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Defendant Arguerralde From Action Without Prejudice, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/2011. (Jessen, A)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2010 granting nunc pro tunc 71 Motion for Extension of time to file motion to dismiss; disregarding 75 Motion regarding case status as moot; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 73 MOTION to DISMISS filed by S. Meyst be GRANTED. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 1/3/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Arguerralde be dismissed from this action without prejudice, referred to Judge Wanger, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2010. Objections to F&R due by 1/10/2011. (Marrujo, C)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Denying FOURTH Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document # 68 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/24/2010. (Scrivner, E)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 52 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/16/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be Granted and this 16 Action be Dismissed Without Prejudice; Objections Due Within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/13/2009. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 11/16/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within THIRTY DAYS why Defendant ARGURRAIDE should not be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service. Show Cause Response due by 5/7/2009. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/3/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 27 Motion For Entry of Default as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/31/2009. (Esteves, C)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding Service of Second Amended Complaint appropriate, and forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return within Thirty Days re 1 . signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/29/09. (service docs and amended complaint; enclosed)(Gil-Garcia, A)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS; DISMISSING Defendants Bonner and James A. Yates; Action Shall Proceed on Plantiff's Second Amended Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/9/2009. (Figueroa, O)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Or Pay Filing Fee, signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2007. IFP Deadline due by 11/21/2007. (Scrivner, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowd v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lamont Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?