Smith v. Schwarzenegger et al
Plaintiff: Michael Lenoir Smith
Defendant: Schwarzenegger, Tilton, Kernan, Yates, Beels and Scott
Case Number: 1:2007cv01547
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Susan R. Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re 196 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 4/4/16. (Verduzco, M)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Re Motions, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 2/25/16. CASE CLOSED. Granting 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying Motions 155 , 175 , 182 , 185 . (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Re Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 10/20/15. Deadline: 11/6/2015 (Gonzalez, R)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 9/21/15: Plaintiff shall mail a copy of his opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Friday, October 9, 2015 to Judge Bolton directly. (Hellings, J)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER on Motions for Extensions 163 , 165 , signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 7/21/15. (Gonzalez, R)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting Motion 159 , signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 6/9/15. (Verduzco, M)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING 153 Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 05/12/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 4/28/15: Plaintiff's responsive memorandum to Motion for Summary Judgment due no later than May 26, 2015. (Hellings, J)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 1/29/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 1/16/15: This case is REFERRED to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program; Defendants' status update as to the VDRP due no later than March 13, 2015, the current dispositive motion deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 1/7/15: Plaintiff's Motion for Referral into the VDRP is DENIED; Defendants' filing due no later than Friday, January 16, 2015. (Hellings, J)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 10/15/2014. Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Due November 10, 2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 124 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 09/17/2014. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 9/15/2014. IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents (Doc. 122 ). (Production of Documents Deadline: 10/23/2014) (Fahrney, E)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 4/10/2014. Show Cause Response due within 7 days. (Sant Agata, S)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 3/26/14: Counsel for Defendants to advise the Court of the status of this case and Plaintiff's current address in the California Department of Corrections within 10 days of the date of this Order. (Hellings, J)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying as Moot 107 Motion, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 10/1/13. (Gonzalez, R)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Denying 100 Motion, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 9/25/13. (Gonzalez, R)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply 104 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 85 , signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 9/12/13. (Hellings, J)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying 96 Motion, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 8/15/13. (Verduzco, M)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 8/14/13. (Verduzco, M)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 87 Request for Clarification, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 7/23/13. 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 5/2/2013 denying as moot 78 , 81 and 82 Motions. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 74 Motion Ordering CDCR Prison Officials to Provide Plaintiff's Legal Files and Materials signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 02/15/2013. (Flores, E)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 1/4/2013 denying 67 Motion to Amend the Complaint; substituting Defendant Appeals Coordinator H. Martinez as Defendant Appeals Coordinator John Doe, Clerk to add H. Martinez as a defendant to action. Clerk to send Plaintiff service packet including 64 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Case Management Deadline: 2/11/2013 for plaintiff to return service documents). (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 52 Motion and Request to Amend Complaint; ORDER DENYING Defendants' 60 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint as Moot signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 11/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 10/17/2012 re 60 MOTION to DISMISS. (Filing Deadline: 11/5/2012 for Plaintiff to file a response). (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 7/18/2012. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's July 16, 2012 "Motion and Request to Recuse Susan R. Bolton" (Doc. 50 ) is denied. (Fahrney, E)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER, signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 2/14/11: The Clerk of Court must not forward Plaintiff's January 10, 2011 Notice of Submission of Documents 40 to the United States Marshal. This case must remain closed . (Hellings, J)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Motion 38 , signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 12/20/2010. (Verduzco, M)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 12/16/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Susan R. Bolton on 9/2/2010. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a third amended complaint.(Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lenoir Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?