United States of America v. Approximately $3,199.20 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $3,199.20 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $230.61 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2007cv01587
Filed: October 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending the Grant of Plaintiff's 52 Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/25/2013. Objections to F&R's due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation.(Martinez, A)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/6/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The 46 Findings and Recommendation dated 1/14/2013, are ADOPTED IN FULL; and 2. The 34 Motion to Set Aside Administrative Forfeiture of Seized Jewelry is DENIED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 34 Motion to Set Aside Administrative Forfeiture of Seized Jewelry signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/14/2013. Objections to F&R's due within fifteen (15) days of service.(Martinez, A)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing the Parties to Address the Procedural Posture of This Case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/9/2012. (Bradley, A)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING 18 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/2011. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Bradley, A)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION for relief from stay signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2011. (Figueroa, O)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Monetary Sanctions Should Not be Imposed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/8/2011. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Bradley, A)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving application for publication signed by Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/7/2007. (Lucas, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $3,199.20 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie Hamilton Borchers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,199.20 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $230.61 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?