Bonds et al v. Nicoletti Oil, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry Bonds, Gayle Bonds, Jesus Aguilar, Joe Anderson, Rose Anderson, Jim Ballanger, Jeanie Ballanger, Charles Bates, Loretta Bates, Pedro Bermudez, Hortencia Bermudez, Linda Butler, Gloria Cardenas, Thomas M. Climer, David Darnell, Felix Esquivel, Delia Esquivel, Pablo Martinez, Ezequivel Ortega, Joe Ortega, Hope Ortega, Bobby Parsons and Jeff Sullivan
Defendant: Nicoletti Oil, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv01600
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Dates For Discovery, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/27/2010. (The deadline for disclosure of expert witnesses and exchange of expert reports shall be September 30, 2010; The deadline to designate any experts to be called solely for puposes of rebuttal shall be no later than October 29, 2010; and The deadline to exchange any reports to be used solely for purposes of rebuttal shall be no later than November 30, 2010.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time For Fact Discovery, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/29/2010. (Discovery due by 7/31/2010, Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 8/30/2010, Expert discovery due 1/31/2011, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2011, Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing previously set for 10/15/2010 Shall be heard 3/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.)(Gaumnitz, R) Modified on 2/2/2010 (Gaumnitz, R).
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION Rescheduling Mandatory Scheduling Conference And ORDER Thereon, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/11/2009. (Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds et al v. Nicoletti Oil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bonds
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Bonds
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Aguilar
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Anderson
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Anderson
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Ballanger
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Ballanger
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bates
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Bates
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Bermudez
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hortencia Bermudez
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Butler
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Cardenas
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Climer
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Darnell
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Esquivel
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Esquivel
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Martinez
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezequivel Ortega
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ortega
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Ortega
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Parsons
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Sullivan
Represented By: Eric W. Chaudron-NOT CAED ADMITTED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicoletti Oil, Inc.
Represented By: Rene Pierre Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?