Waltz v. United States of America Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Bessie Irene Waltz
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture, Department of Forestry and Richard Ernest Bailey
Case Number: 1:2007cv01691
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion for Costs 83 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/16/2011. (Herman, H)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED ORDER 79 Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 20 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 03/29/2010. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DISMISSING Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/4/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER STAYING This Action Pending Consideration of Petition for Certiorari. ORDER DIRECTING The Parties to Inform the Court Upon Learning of Denial of the Petition for Certiorari. ORDER DIRECTING the Parties to Participate in, and Plaintiff to Arrange, a Telephonic Status Conference Concerning the Petition for Certiorari and the Motion to Dismiss. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/23/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/19/2009. (Herman, H)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION to Continue Briefing of Opposition and Reply to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(6) for 30 days; ORDER - 1) Plaintiff's oppositon filed by 9/21/2009. 2) Defendant's reply filed by 10/5/2009. signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/24/2009. (Herman, H)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION re: Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and ORDER thereon - (1) Defendant will file its supplemental brief in support of the Motion to Dismiss originally filed by Defendant on 2/19/2008 20 , no later than 7/30/2009; (2) Plaintiff will file her opposition to the Motion to Dismiss no later than 8/24/2009; (3) Defendant will file its reply brief to Plaintiff's opposition brief no later than 9/11/2009. signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/15/2009. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waltz v. United States of America Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Forestry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ernest Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Irene Waltz
Represented By: Warren Robin Paboojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?