Garcia v. Masiel et al
Plaintiff: Robert Garcia
Defendant: A. Masiel, F. Ojeda, A. Balderama, L. Silva, Davis, Akin and R. Hall
Case Number: 1:2007cv01750
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion 109 and Directing Clerk of Court to Send Copy of Docket to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/23/12. (Gonzalez, R)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DISMISSING Action, With Prejudice, Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ECF No. 106 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/6/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Referring Case to the Prisoner ADR Program for a Settlement Conference on October 27, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/27/2011. Pretrial Statement due by 12/1/2011; Settlement Conference set for 10/27/2011 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Before United States Magistrate Judge Crag M. Kellison Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/11. Twenty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Notifying Plaintiff of Witness Fees and Costs Due to Subpoena Unincarcerated Witnesses Who Refuse to Testify Voluntarily 87 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/11/11. (Gonzalez, R)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 85 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/10/2011. (Flores, E)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Adopting 74 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, and REFERRING Matter back to Magistrate Judge signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/06/2011. (Martin, S)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/13/2010, Recommending that Defendants 57 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be DENIED; Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 1/18/2011. (Marrujo, C)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING 71 Motion and Request for Clerk's Records and Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/13/2010. (Marrujo, C)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/9/2010. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Motions: 47 Motion for Reconsideration for Counsel; 51 Motion for Postponement of Deposition and Reconsideration of Appointment of Counsel ; 52 Motion Disqualification of Defendant's Counsel; 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/30/2010. (Marrujo, C)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 48 Request to Modify Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/7/2010. Dispositive Motion Deadline: July 6, 2010. (Sant Agata, S)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING as Moot Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Postponement of Deposition by Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/22/2010. (Bradley, A)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/29/2009. (Bradley, A)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendants' First Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading 19 , (Responsive Pleading deadline: 6/1/2009.) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/24/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 10 , and DISMISSING Certain Defendants signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/2009. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Masiel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Masiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Ojeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Balderama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?