Jones et al v. California Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Christine Jones and Mark - Jones
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Kenneth Clark
Case Number: 1:2008cv00069
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Pursuant to Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/2/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Witness is no Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/01/2017. (Flores, E)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Mark Jones, CDCR #C-12452, in Courtroom #4, 7th Floor, United States Courthouse, 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California on March 1, 2017, at 8:30 a.m., signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/11/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Mark Jones, CDCR# C-12452, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/16. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Verduzco, M)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing 120 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/28/16. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER re Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/4/16. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, re 111 USCA Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/26/15. (Gonzalez, R)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER After Evidentiary Hearing Reinstating Prior Dismissal and Dismissing Action Without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/02/15. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's February 25, 2015, 102 Declaration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/26/2015. (Marrujo, C)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff To Submit Additional Briefing (Document 98 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/10/2015.(Filing Deadline: 2/20/2015) (Fahrney, E)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Mark Jones, CDCR# C-12452, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/7/15. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/2/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Verduzco, M)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Mark Jones, CDCR# C-12452 for proceedings on December 8, 2014 at 9:30a.m. in Courtroom 4, before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/26/14. (Gonzalez, R)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Mark Jones, CDCR# C-12452 for proceedings on December 8, 2014 at 12:15 p.m., Courtroom 4 (LJO), Seventh Floor, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/19/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/14.(Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/8/2014 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Providing Plaintiff Option to (1) Stand on Existing Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or (2) File Amended Opposition per Amended Second Informational Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/18/12. 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting 56 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action, without Prejudice, for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/12/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections due within thirty days. (Verduzco, M)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 61 and 66 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 06/14/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation Dismissing With Prejudice, Certain Claims Found to Be Not Cognizable 40 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/13/11. (Gonzalez, R)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 4/4/2011. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Action Proceed on Plaintiffs 39 Fifth Amended Complaint Against Defendant Couch; All Remaining Claims be Dismissed With Prejudice; Defendants California Department of Corrections, Kathleen Allison, Kenneth Clark, and Two Does be Dismissed With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 3/11/2011, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 4/14/2011. (Marrujo, C)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING Fourth Amended Complaint, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; ORDER SEVERING Action and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Re-Open Case 1:08-cv-01383-LJO-SMS (PC); THIRTY DAY DEADLINE signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 1/28/2011. Amended Complaint due by 3/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONSOLIDATING Actions And Designating Lead Case As 1:08-cv-00069-LJO-SMS(PC), ORDER For Clerk To Administratively Close Case 1:08-cv-01383-LJO-SMS(PC), ORDER For Lead Case To Proceed On Original Complaint Filed December 5, 2007,signed by Magist rate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/2009. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to: file, docket, and serve a copy of this order in both cases. Administratively close case 1:08-cv-1383-LJO-SMS(PC). Reinstate Christine Jones as Co-plaintiff in lead case 1:08-cv-00069-LJO-SMS(PC). The lead case shall proceed on the original complaint filed December 5, 2007, by Co-plaintiffs. The Court shall screen the original complaint forthwith. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark - Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?