Broughton v. Yates et al

Plaintiff: Kendall Broughton
Defendant: James Yates and F. Igbinosa
Case Number: 1:2008cv00283
Filed: February 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 12 Motion for the Court to Screen Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/15/2010. (Martin, S)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Dismissal of Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/25/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/28/2010. (Flores, E)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 5 Request for Remand, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/2009. (Sondheim, M)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that plaintiff's request for remand be DENIED signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/17/2009. Motion referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Objections to F&R due by 3/23/2009. (Esteves, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broughton v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Represented By: Ellen Y. Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Igbinosa
Represented By: Ellen Y. Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?